NCH Healthcare System, Inc. v. The Leapfrog Group
Plaintiff: NCH Healthcare System, Inc.
Defendant: The Leapfrog Group
Case Number: 2:2019cv00786
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDERED: This case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court of the Twentieth Judicial Circuit in and for Collier County, Florida. The Clerk is DIRECTED to transmit a certified copy of this Order to the Clerk of the Circuit Court of the Twentieth Judicial Circuit in and for Collier County, Florida. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate any pending motions or deadlines and close the file. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/8/2019. (AEH)
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #8 Response to order to show cause filed by NCH Healthcare System, Inc.. (Withers, Ashley)
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE re #3 Order to show cause filed by The Leapfrog Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Defendant's Response to Order to Show Cause)(Zibas, Jura) Modified on 11/6/2019 as to docket text(MLS).
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Injunction (Doc. #6) is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/31/2019. (AEH)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 Plaintiff's MOTION for temporary injunction by NCH Healthcare System, Inc. (filed in State Court 10/29/19) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MLS)
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against The Leapfrog Group with Jury Demand filed (in State Court 10/22/19) by NCH Healthcare System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(MLS)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/31/2019. (MLS)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED: Defendant The Leapfrog Group shall SHOW CAUSE on or before November 6, 2019, as to why this case should not be remanded for failure to establish diversity subject-matter jurisdiction at the time of removal. Failure to comply with this Order will result in immediate remand without further notice. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/30/2019. (AEH)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:19-cv-786-FtM-38MRM. (SJB)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the 20th Judicial Circuit, In and For Collier County, case number 11-2019-CA-004266-0001-XX filed in State Court on 10/22/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16087314 filed by The Leapfrog Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zibas, Jura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NCH Healthcare System, Inc. v. The Leapfrog Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NCH Healthcare System, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley P. Withers
Represented By: Ashley Withers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Leapfrog Group
Represented By: Jura Christine Zibas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?