Newson et al v. Cape Coral School Authority et al
Plaintiff: Shark Family Parent Group and Rondell Newson
Defendant: Florida High School Association, Cape Coral School Authority and Oasis High School
Case Number: 2:2019cv00791
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 JUDGMENT (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (drn)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER. On November 1, 2019, the Court found the Complaint failed to show federal subject-matter jurisdiction and ordered Plaintiff to file an amended complaint on or before November 15, 2019, if he believed he could plead jurisdiction. Plaintiff did not file an amended complaint. Accordingly, the case is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment and close the case. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 12/9/2019. (NMC)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Leonard E. Ireland, Jr on behalf of Florida High School Association (Ireland, Leonard)
November 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #3 Plaintiff Rondell Newson's Motion Requesting an Emergency Hearing and Temporary Restraining Order. Newson's Emergency Complaint of Temporary Restraining Order #1 is DISMISSED without prejudice. Newson may file an amended complaint consistent with this order on or before November 15, 2019. Failure to do so will result in the Court closing this case without further notice. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/2/2019. (LMF)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for temporary restraining order by Rondell Newson, Shark Family Parent Group. (RMT)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 11/1/2019. (drn)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 EMERGENCY COMPLAINT against Cape Coral School Authority, Florida High School Association, Oasis High School Filing fee $400, receipt number FtM014181 filed by Rondell Newson, Shark Family/Parent Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(RMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newson et al v. Cape Coral School Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shark Family Parent Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondell Newson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida High School Association
Represented By: Leonard E. Ireland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cape Coral School Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oasis High School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?