Abreu v. Meade et al
Petitioner: Ana Mercedes Romera Abreu
Respondent: U.S. Immigration Customs Enforcement and Michael Meade
Case Number: 2:2019cv00801
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner shall, within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, pay $5.00 to the Clerk of the Court. A check from a penal institution, a cashier's check, or a money order should be made payable to "Clerk, U.S. District Court." Personal checks will not be accepted. SEE Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 12/27/2019. (MLS)
December 16, 2019 Filing 9 PRISONER financial certificate by Ana Mercedes Romera Abreu. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(SLU)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER to show cause as to Ana Mercedes Romera Abreu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 12/13/2019. (LMF) . Modified on 12/17/2019 (removed attachment (duplicate). (LMF).
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION (submitted and filed as a two-sided pleading) of Ana Mercedes Romera Abreu re #1 Petition for writ of habeas corpus by Ana Mercedes Romera Abreu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Mailing Envelope) (previously filed in 2:19-cv-847-FtM-38MRM Doc. 1)(SLU)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to pay the $5.00 filing fee in full for this action or file proof of indigency. Fee or Proof of indigency due within twenty-one (21) days from the date on this Order. Petitioner's failure to timely comply with this Order, or explain her inability to comply, may result in the dismissal of this action without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 11/18/2019. (SLU)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 11/13/2019. (SLU)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER for all confined, pro se litigants. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 11/13/2019. (SLU)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 11/27/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 11/13/2019. (SLU)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; FEE waiver request by Ana Mercedes Romero Abreu. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (SLU) Modified on 11/12/2019 to edit event and docket text (SLU).
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Federal - INS Detainee filed by Ana Mercedes Romera Abreu. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(SLU)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abreu v. Meade et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ana Mercedes Romera Abreu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Immigration Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Meade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?