Williamson v. United States of America
Petitioner: Willie Williamson
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv00857
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying without prejudice #4 Motion to appoint counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 12/20/2019. (SLU)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing United States of America to respond to #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 2:17-cr-48-FtM-38MRM. Responses due within sixty (60) days. Petitioner, although not required to do so, may file a reply to the response within (21) twenty-one days thereafter. The Clerk shall strike and return Petitioner's Declaration in Support of Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and printout of Petitioner's Inmate Statement #1 at 9-21 to Petitioner. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 12/19/2019. (SLU) Modified on 1/31/2020 to edit docket text (SLU).
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Willie Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(SLU) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by United States of America. Related case(s): yes (Eth, Simon)
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/18/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 12/4/2019. (SLU)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 2:17-cr-48-FtM-38MRM filed by Willie Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(SLU)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williamson v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Charles D. Schmitz
Represented By: Simon R. Eth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Willie Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?