Doland v. Florida Department of Corrections (Dade County)
Petitioner: Jeffrey Doland
Respondent: Florida Department of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2019cv00865
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ft. Myers Office
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Florida Northern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00545. File received electronically
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER adopting #3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The Clerk is directed to transfer the case to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Fort Myers Division. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/4/2019. (MB) [Transferred from flnd on 12/5/2019.]
December 4, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. *No objections filed* (toy) [Transferred from flnd on 12/5/2019.]
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO TRANSFER PETITION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by JEFFREY DOLAND - Because Petitioner Doland is not incarcerated in the Northern District of Florida, this Court lacks jurisdiction over the 2241 habeas petition. Therefore, it is therefore respectfully RECOMMENDED that the case file, including any service copies and pending motions, be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Fort Myers Division, for all further proceedings. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 11/05/2019. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 12/3/2019. (toy) [Transferred from flnd on 12/5/2019.]
November 1, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (toy) [Transferred from flnd on 12/5/2019.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se (toy) [Transferred from flnd on 12/5/2019.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by JEFFREY DOLAND. (No fee/IFP, No service copies) (toy) [Transferred from flnd on 12/5/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doland v. Florida Department of Corrections (Dade County)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeffrey Doland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Florida Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?