Lindo v. Florida Department of Corrections et al
Petitioner: Leon L. Lindo
Respondent: Mark S Inch, D. Snyder, Florida Departent of Corrections and J.T. Mundella
Case Number: 2:2020cv00019
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-25028. File received electronically
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AFFIRMING AND ADOPTING REPORT OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE; Affirming and Adopting #5 Report and Recommendations. Certificate of Appealability: No Ruling Closing Case. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 1/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs) [Transferred from flsd on 1/10/2020.]
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 42 USC 1983 case re #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens filed by Leon L. Lindo ; Recommending that Plaintiff's Complaint be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida for all further proceedings and this case be CLOSED by the Clerk of Court. Objections to R&R due by 12/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 12/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn) [Transferred from flsd on 1/10/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Compel by Leon L. Lindo. Responses due by 12/19/2019 (ebz) [Transferred from flsd on 1/10/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Leon L. Lindo. (ebz) [Transferred from flsd on 1/10/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (ebz) [Transferred from flsd on 1/10/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Florida Department of Corrections, Mark S. Inch, J.T. Mundella, D. Snyder. Filing fee $ 400.00. NOT PAID/DUE/IFP Filed, filed by Leon L. Lindo.(ebz) [Transferred from flsd on 1/10/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindo v. Florida Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mark S Inch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: D. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Florida Departent of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: J.T. Mundella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Leon L. Lindo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?