Fairstein v. Netflix, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Linda Fairstein
Defendant: Attica Locke, Netflix, Inc. and Ava DuVernay
Case Number: 2:2020cv00180
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED ORDER: The "Agreed Motion Requesting Leave to File Briefs in Excess of 25 Pages" (Doc. #22) is hereby granted. Defendant Netflix, Inc. may file a motion to dismiss and supporting memorandum of law that does not exceed forty pages, excluding captions and signatures. Plaintiff Linda Fairstein may file a response in opposition that does not exceed forty pages, excluding captions and signatures. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 5/8/2020. (ANL)
May 8, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for leave to file a response in excess of 25 pages by Netflix, Inc. (Price, Kelley) Modified to edit event on 5/8/2020 (MLJ).
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting (Docs. #17, #18, #19) the Motions to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The Clerk is directed to add Jacqueline A. Gianni, Esq., Natalie J. Spears, Esq., and Gregory R. Naron, Esq. to the service list; unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Jacqueline A. Gianni, Esq., Natalie J. Spears, Esq., and Gregory R. Naron, Esq. must send the required fee to the Clerk's Office, unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Jacqueline A. Gianni, Esq., Natalie J. Spears, Esq., and Gregory R. Naron, Esq. must complete and submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. Failure to register may cause the Court to revoke permission to appear specially. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 5/7/2020. (JTB)
May 7, 2020 Filing 20 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Netflix, Inc.. (Price, Kelley)
May 7, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Gregory R. Naron to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-16787859 for $150 by Netflix, Inc.. (Price, Kelley) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
May 7, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Natalie J. Spears to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-16787827 for $150 by Netflix, Inc.. (Price, Kelley) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
May 7, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Jacqueline A. Giannini to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-16787696 for $150 by Netflix, Inc.. (Price, Kelley) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
March 25, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric S. Olson on behalf of Ava DuVernay, Attica Locke, Netflix, Inc. (Olson, Eric)
March 25, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelley Geraghty Price on behalf of Ava DuVernay, Attica Locke, Netflix, Inc. (Price, Kelley)
March 25, 2020 Filing 14 TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 3/25/2020. (jmc) (jmc).
March 23, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER of service returned executed on 03/19/2020 by Linda Fairstein as to Netflix, Inc.. (Swanson, Kimberly)
March 23, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER of service returned executed on 03/19/2020 by Linda Fairstein as to Attica Locke. (Swanson, Kimberly)
March 23, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER of service returned executed on 03/19/2020 by Linda Fairstein as to Ava DuVernay. (Swanson, Kimberly)
March 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk is directed to add Andrew Miltenberg to the service list. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Andrew Miltenberg must send the required fee to the Clerk's Office. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Andrew Miltenberg must complete and submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. Failure to register may cause the Court to revoke permission to appear specially. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 3/21/2020. (McCoy, Mac)
March 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk is directed to add Kara Gorycki to the service list. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Kara Gorycki must send the required fee to the Clerk's Office. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Kara Gorycki must complete and submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. Failure to register may cause the Court to revoke permission to appear specially. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 3/21/2020. (McCoy, Mac)
March 19, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Andrew Miltenberg, appearing on behalf of Linda Fairstein (Filing fee $150 receipt number FTM014506.) Related document: #6 MOTION for Andrew Miltenberg to appear pro hac vice . (SPB)
March 19, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Kara Goryci, appearing on behalf of Linda Fairstein (Filing fee $150 receipt number FTM014506.) Related document: #5 MOTION for Kara Gorycki to appear pro hac vice . (SPB)
March 18, 2020 Filing 8 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:20-cv-180-FtM-MRM. Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell no longer assigned to the case. Motion(s) REFERRED: #6 MOTION for Andrew Miltenberg to appear pro hac vice , #5 MOTION for Kara Gorycki to appear pro hac vice . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (laf)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER of recusal. Magistrate Judge Mizell hereby disqualifies himself from these proceedings, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455 and in the interest of justice. This case shall be transferred to the next assigned Magistrate Judge in the Fort Myers Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 3/18/2020. (brh)
March 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Andrew Miltenberg to appear pro hac vice by Linda Fairstein. (Swanson, Kimberly) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
March 18, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Kara Gorycki to appear pro hac vice by Linda Fairstein. (Swanson, Kimberly) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
March 18, 2020 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:20-cv-180-FtM-60NPM. (SJB)
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachael S. Loukonen on behalf of Linda Fairstein (Loukonen, Rachael)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Dawn Swanson on behalf of Linda Fairstein (Swanson, Kimberly)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Linda Fairstein with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16604784) filed by Linda Fairstein. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Netflix notice letter, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - DuVernay notice letter, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Locke notice letter)(Cheffy, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fairstein v. Netflix, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attica Locke
Represented By: Jacqueline A. Giannini
Represented By: Gregory R. Naron
Represented By: Natalie J. Spears
Represented By: Eric S. Olson
Represented By: Kelley Geraghty Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netflix, Inc.
Represented By: Jacqueline A. Giannini
Represented By: Gregory R. Naron
Represented By: Natalie J. Spears
Represented By: Eric S. Olson
Represented By: Kelley Geraghty Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ava DuVernay
Represented By: Jacqueline A. Giannini
Represented By: Gregory R. Naron
Represented By: Natalie J. Spears
Represented By: Eric S. Olson
Represented By: Kelley Geraghty Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Fairstein
Represented By: Kimberly Dawn Swanson
Represented By: Rachael S. Loukonen
Represented By: Andrew T. Miltenberg
Represented By: Kara Gorycki
Represented By: Edward K. Cheffy
Represented By: Kara L. Gorycki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?