Dana Bozian v. Circle K Stores Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dana Bozian
Defendant: Pro Fab-Tech, Inc. and Circle K Stores Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00365
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 40:875
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Verona, Catherine)
June 16, 2020 Filing 10 Case Reassigned to John L. Badalamenti. New case number: 2:20-cv-365-FtM-66NPM. Judge Thomas P. Barber no longer assigned to the case. (MLJ)
June 10, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Track 2 Notice and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dana Bozian identifying Other Affiliate Circle K Stores Inc., Other Affiliate Robert M. Stoler, Other Affiliate Medicare, Other Affiliate Catherine M Verona, Other Affiliate Stoler Russell Keener Verona, Other Affiliate Dana Bozian, Other Affiliate Anthony Hevia, Other Affiliate Vargas Gonzalez Hevia Baldwin, LLP for Dana Bozian.. (Hevia, Anthony)
June 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Track 2 Notice and Corporate Disclosure Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Dana Bozian. Related case(s): yes (Hevia, Anthony) Modified on 6/10/2020 to correct docket text (MLS).
May 26, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Track 2 Notice and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Circle K Stores Inc.. (Verona, Catherine)
May 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Circle K Stores Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Verona, Catherine)
May 20, 2020 Filing 5 TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 5/20/2020. (jmc)
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand (filed in State Court 3/6/20) by Circle K Stores Inc..(MLS)
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Circle K Stores Inc., Pro Fab-Tech, Inc. with Jury Demand filed (in State Court 2/5/20) by Dana Bozian.(MLS)
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:20-cv-365-FtM-60NPM. (SJB)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Collier County, case number 20-CA-374 filed in State Court on 2/5/2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16830328 filed by Circle K Stores Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 State Court COMPLAINT, #8 State Court ANSWER, #9 State Court Docket Sheet, #10 State Court Other Documents, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Verona, Catherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dana Bozian v. Circle K Stores Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Bozian
Represented By: Anthony Carlos Hevia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pro Fab-Tech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Circle K Stores Inc.
Represented By: Robert M. Stoler
Represented By: Catherine Marie Verona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?