CMR Construction & Roofing LLC v. The Orchards Condominium Association, Inc.
Plaintiff: CMR Construction & Roofing LLC
Defendant: The Orchards Condominium Association, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00422
Filed: June 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mac R McCoy
Referring Judge: John E Steele
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by CMR Construction & Roofing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AOB and Agreement, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Complaint)(Feldman, Alan)
August 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by CMR Construction & Roofing LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Feldman, Alan)
June 24, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER of service returned executed on June 23, 2020 by CMR Construction & Roofing LLC as to The Orchards Condominium Association, Inc.. (Feldman, Alan)
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST for waiver of Service sent to All Defendants on June 17, 2020 by CMR Construction & Roofing LLC. (Feldman, Alan)
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to The Orchards Condominium Association, Inc. (drn)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 6/17/2020. (jmc)
June 16, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John E. Steele and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:20-cv-422-FtM-29MRM. (SJB)
June 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Orchards Condominium Association, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16944595) filed by CMR Construction & Roofing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #8 Proposed Summons Summons)(Feldman, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CMR Construction & Roofing LLC v. The Orchards Condominium Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CMR Construction & Roofing LLC
Represented By: Alan Seth Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Orchards Condominium Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?