Triton Renovation, Inc. v. Empire Indemnity Insurance Company
Plaintiff: TRITON RENOVATION, INC., A/A/O ST. CROIX AT PELICAN MARSH CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION and Triton Renovation, Inc.
Defendant: Empire Indemnity Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00432
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss THE PETITION TO COMPEL APPRAISAL filed by Triton Renovation, Inc.. (Kubiak, Kelly)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss. By August 14, 2020, Plaintiff will file a response to the motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 8/10/2020. (brh)
August 6, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss THE PETITION TO COMPEL APPRAISAL by Triton Renovation, Inc.. (Kubiak, Kelly) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying as moot in part #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant requests that the deadline to file the parties' Case Management Report, Pretrial & Discovery Plan, Related Case Notice, and initial disclosures be extended to August 6, 2020. The Court will extend the initial disclosures deadline to August 6, 2020. However, in its notice setting the preliminary pretrial conference (Doc. 6) in this case, the Court set a deadline of August 20, 2020 for the parties to file their Case Management Report and Pretrial & Discovery Plan. That date remains in effect and therefore the parties' requested extension of time for these deadlines is moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 7/30/2020. (brh)
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND FILE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT, PRETRIAL DISCOVERY PLAN, AND RELATED CASE NOTICE by Empire Indemnity Insurance Company. (Howell, Phillip) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
July 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE re 6 Notice of hearing for Preliminary Pretrial Conference. All parties shall appear telephonically. The toll-free teleconference number is 1-877-873-8018. The access code is 5997085. You will then be prompted to enter a participant security code: 20432. All parties are encouraged to utilize a landline or similarly stable connection free of ambient interference to avoid having any portion of the conference conducted without them. (WRW)
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/27/2020 at 10:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 4 E before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Parties shall file a Case Management Report and Pretrial & Discovery Plan by 8/20/2020.(WRW)
June 22, 2020 Filing 5 TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 6/22/2020. (jmc)
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 PETITION TO COMPEL APPRAISAL against Empire Indemnity Insurance Company with Jury Demand filed in State Court on 5/22/20 by Triton Renovation, Inc.(drn)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss THE PETITION TO COMPEL APPRAISAL by Empire Indemnity Insurance Company. (Howell, Phillip) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:20-cv-432-FtM-66NPM. (SJB)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Collier County Circuit Court, case number 2020-CA-001656 filed in State Court on May 22, 2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16956499 filed by Empire Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Petition to Compel Appraisal, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Federal Cover Sheet Signed)(Howell, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Triton Renovation, Inc. v. Empire Indemnity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRITON RENOVATION, INC., A/A/O ST. CROIX AT PELICAN MARSH CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Kelly Kubiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Triton Renovation, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly Kubiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Phillip S. Howell
Represented By: Maggie E. Potter
Represented By: David Thayer Burr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?