Baker v. Lee Memorial Health System
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Baker
Defendant: Lee Memorial Health System
Case Number: 2:2020cv00483
Filed: July 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 9/1/2020 by Jacqueline Baker as to Lee Memorial Health System. (Yormak, Benjamin)
July 9, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Track 2 Notice and Corporate Disclosure Order by Jacqueline Baker. (Yormak, Benjamin)
July 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Track 2 Notice and Corporate Disclosure Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jacqueline Baker. Related case(s): No. (Yormak, Benjamin)
July 8, 2020 Filing 4 TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 7/8/2020. (jmc)
July 7, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Lee Memorial Health System. (drn)
July 7, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:20-cv-483-FtM-66NPM. (SJB)
July 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lee Memorial Health System with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17022529) filed by Jacqueline Baker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Yormak, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Lee Memorial Health System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Memorial Health System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Baker
Represented By: Benjamin H. Yormak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?