Lane v. State of Florida
Plaintiff: Seth Cordell Lane
Defendant: State of Florida
Case Number: 2:2020cv00506
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 JUDGMENT ( Signed by Deputy Clerk) (RMT)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER dismissing case without prejudice under M.D. Fla. R. 1.03(e). Because the dismissal is without prejudice, Plaintiff may pursue a new case by filing a new complaint--not using this case number--and include the filing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment, terminate any pending motions or deadlines, and close this case. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 8/21/2020. (SLU)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 TRACK ONE AND RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 7/20/2020. (SLU)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER FOR INCARCERATED PRO SE PLAINTIFFS. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 7/20/2020. (SLU)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of civil action for violation of 6th Amendment Right to Speedy Trial by Seth Cordell Lane (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (no fee/ifp)(SLU)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lane v. State of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth Cordell Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?