Rolando Segura Vegas v. Tiki Bar Lighthouse, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rolando Segura Vegas
Defendant: Tiki Bar Lighthouse, Inc. and Thomas F. Kolar
Case Number: 2:2020cv00508
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. By September 15, 2020, Plaintiff will file a response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 9/8/2020. (brh)
September 8, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Strike and Memorandum in Support by Rolando Segura Vegas. (Palma, Zandro) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER. See order for Court deadlines and directives. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 8/27/2020. (SMG)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 8/26/2020. (SMG)
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Thomas F. Kolar, Tiki Bar Lighthouse, Inc.. (Mueller, Vincent)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Strike and Memorandum in Support by All Defendants. (Mueller, Vincent)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 08/04/2020 by Rolando Segura Vegas as to Tiki Bar Lighthouse, Inc.. (Palma, Zandro)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 7/17/2020. (jmc)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Tiki Bar Lighthouse, Inc.. (MLS)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Thomas F. Kolar. (MLS)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:20-cv-508-FtM-66NPM. (SJB)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thomas F. Kolar, Tiki Bar Lighthouse, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17069787) filed by Rolando Segura Vegas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Palma, Zandro) Modified on 7/17/2020 to amend docket text (MLS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rolando Segura Vegas v. Tiki Bar Lighthouse, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiki Bar Lighthouse, Inc.
Represented By: Vincent Joseph Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas F. Kolar
Represented By: Vincent Joseph Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rolando Segura Vegas
Represented By: Zandro E. Palma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?