Chambers v. Schiff Realty, Inc.
Plaintiff: Delroy A. Chambers, Jr.
Defendant: Schiff Realty, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00511
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Schiff Realty, Inc.. (Powers, Robson)
September 9, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice by Delroy A. Chambers, Jr. (Heller, Shawn)
September 9, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Delroy A. Chambers, Jr. Related case(s): no (Heller, Shawn)
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Heller, Shawn)
September 9, 2020 Filing 12 PRETRIAL AND DISCOVERY PLAN. (Heller, Shawn)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED: Plaintiff Delroy Chambers' Motion for Extension of Time Nunc Pro Tunc to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, and Request That the Court Vacate Its Order and Opinion (Doc. #10) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 9/4/2020. (AEH)
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically FOR EXTENSION OF TIME NUNC PRO TUNC TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, AND REQUEST THAT THE COURT VACATE ITS ORDER AND OPINION (DOC. 8) by Delroy A. Chambers, Jr. (Heller, Shawn) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Schiff Realty, Inc. with Jury Demand. filed by Delroy A. Chambers, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Related License Information for Carlos Florez)(Heller, Shawn)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDERED: Defendant Schiff Realty, Inc's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #6) is GRANTED. Plaintiff Delroy A. Chambers, Jr.'s Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. Chambers may file an amended complaint on or before September 17, 2020. Otherwise, the Court will close this case without further notice. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/31/2020. (AEH)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of hearing: Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/13/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. DIAL IN INSTRUCTIONS: TOLL FREE NUMBER: 1-888-273-3658, ACCESS CODE: 8335587. Dial in at least 5 minutes before hearing time. Landline preferred. Do not use the speaker phone feature during the call. Notwithstanding any prior Order of the Court, the parties shall file a joint Case Management Report no later than 10/5/2020. To the extent Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2) so requires, the Court finds good cause to extend the time period for entering the Case Management and Scheduling Order until after the Case Management Report is filed and the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is held.(jmc)
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Schiff Realty, Inc.. (Powers, Robson)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN of service executed on 7/22/2020 by Delroy A. Chambers, Jr as to Schiff Realty, Inc.. (Heller, Shawn)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 7/17/2020. (jmc)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Schiff Realty, Inc. (drn)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:20-cv-511-FtM-38MRM. (SJB)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Schiff Realty, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17070397) filed by Delroy A. Chambers, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Heller, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chambers v. Schiff Realty, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schiff Realty, Inc.
Represented By: Robson David Charles Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delroy A. Chambers, Jr.
Represented By: Shawn Alex Heller
Represented By: Joshua Aaron Glickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?