Rosato v. Sawyer et al
Plaintiff: Dominic Anthony Rosato
Defendant: Donald Sawyer, Rick Sloan and JP Carner
Case Number: 2:2020cv00532
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 JUDGMENT (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (drn)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER dismissing case without prejudice. The Clerk shall enter judgment, deny any pending motions as moot, terminate any deadlines, and close this case. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 8/21/2020. (SLU)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to file amended complaint on an approved form. Amended Complaint due by 8/17/2020. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff a copy of this Order and a blank civil rights complaint form bearing the above-captioned case number and the title "Amended Complaint." The Court warns Plaintiff that failure to comply with this Order or failure to respond fully and accurately to each of the questions in the civil rights complaint form will result in a dismissal of this action without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 7/27/2020. (SLU)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 TRACK ONE AND RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 7/27/2020. (SLU)
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER for pro se confined litigants. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 7/27/2020. (SLU)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Dominic Anthony Rosato. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(SLU) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JP Carner, Donald Sawyer, Rick Sloan filed by Dominic Anthony Rosato. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Mailing Envelope) (no service copies)(SLU)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosato v. Sawyer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Carner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominic Anthony Rosato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?