Ortiz v. State of Florida et al (Charlotte County)
Petitioner: Israel R. Ortiz
Respondent: Attorney General, State of Florida and Secretary, DOC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00599
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sonya Roebuck Horbelt on behalf of Secretary, DOC (Horbelt, Sonya)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER on or before October 6, 2020, counsel for Respondent is DIRECTED to file a notice of appearance. ORDER to respond and show cause why the petition should not be granted. Response to petition due by 12/22/2020. On or before December 29, 2020, Respondent is DIRECTED to electronically file the state court record on CM/ECF. Petitioner has 30 days to reply to the petition response. The Clerk of Court is directed to electronically serve the petition, any memorandum and exhibits filed with the Petition to Respondent, and a courtesy copy to the Attorney General of the State of Florida; and mail a copy of this Order to Petitioner. If applicable, the Clerk is DIRECTED to dismiss all named Respondents except for the Secretary of the Florida Department of Corrections and terminate them from the file. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 9/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus)(SLU)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 9/22/2020. (SLU)
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Habeas Petition by Israel R. Ortiz. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(RMT) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 TRACK ONE AND RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/18/2020. (RMT)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER Regarding Habeas Petition. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/18/2020. (RMT)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION by a State Prisoner for Writ of Habeas Corpus - State (no service copies; no fee/ifp) filed by Israel R. Ortiz. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(RMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. State of Florida et al (Charlotte County)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary, DOC
Represented By: Sonya Roebuck Horbelt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Israel R. Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?