Patten v. Lown
Plaintiff: Barrington R Patten
Defendant: Christina M. Lown
Case Number: 2:2020cv00605
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 12:1972
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the Affidavit of Indigency (Doc. #4), construed as a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis under 28 U.S.C. 1915 and M.D. Fla. R. 4.07, be DENIED and that this action be DISMISSED. See Report and Recommendation for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 9/10/2020. (NM)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Track 2 Notice and Corporate Disclosure Order by Barrington R Patten. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(MLS)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/24/2020. (WRW)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Christina M. Lown. (RMT)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and demand for Court of Record against Christina M. Lown with Jury Demand filed by Barrington R Patten. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(RMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patten v. Lown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina M. Lown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barrington R Patten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?