S. Y. v. Jay Varahimata Investments, LLC.
Plaintiff: S. Y.
Defendant: Jay Varahimata Investments, LLC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00606
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
2 Judge: John E Steele
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Motion of Virginia E. Anello, Esq. for Special Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Pursuant to Local Rule 2.02, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The Clerk of Court is directed to add Virginia E. Anello to the service list. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Virginia E. Anello must send only one required fee to the Clerk's Office for her special appearance in the first-filed Case No. 2:20-cv-118-JES-MRM. The Court hereby waives the required fee for special admission in connection with all other cases pending in the Fort Myers Division in which Virginia E. Anello is granted leave to appear specially for Plaintiffs S.Y. and/or C.S. This waiver does not apply to any other case in which Virginia E. Anello may seek leave to appear specially for any other party or in any other case pending in another Division. Additionally, given the unique procedural posture of this litigation--including the severance of the first-filed action, the resulting proliferation of separate cases, and the relatedness of the claims and defenses involved in each of the severed actions--the Court finds that Virginia E. Anello's appearance in each severed case brought on behalf of S.Y. and C.S. does not constitute the maintenance of a regular practice of law in Florida such that her special appearance should be denied. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Virginia E. Anello must complete and submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. Failure to register may cause the Court to revoke permission to appear specially. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 10/16/2020. (McCoy, Mac)
October 15, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Virginia E. Anello to appear pro hac vice by S. Y.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sample Order, #2 Exhibit B - Sample Order, #3 Exhibit C - Sample Order)(Hanlon, Sharon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant, Jay Varahimata Investments, LLC's Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Strike, or for a More Definite Statement and Memorandum of Law. Plaintiff must respond to the Motion (Doc. #11) on or before 11/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 10/7/2020. (NM)
October 6, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss complaint by S. Y.. (Hanlon, Sharon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
September 28, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss re #1 Complaint by Jay Varahimata Investments, LLC.. (Beebe, Brooke)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Defendant, Jay Varahimata Investments, LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant must respond to the Complaint (Doc. #1) on or before 9/28/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 9/16/2020. (NM)
September 15, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to re #1 Complaint by Jay Varahimata Investments, LLC.. (Beebe, Brooke) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. Modified on 9/16/2020 to amend docket text (MLS).
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 08/25/2020 by S. Y. as to Jay Varahimata Investments, LLC.. (Hanlon, Sharon)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 Case Reassigned to Judge John E. Steele. New case number: 2:20-cv-606-FtM-29MRM. Judge Sheri Polster Chappell no longer assigned to the case. (laf)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 This action and the following cases are TRANSFERRED to Senior United States District Judge John E. Steele with his consent: S.Y. v. Shivparvti, LLC, No. 2:20-cv-607-FtM-38NPM; S.Y. v. Naples Garden Inn, LLC, No. 2:20-cv-610-FtM-38NPM; S.Y. v. Sunstream Hotel & Resports, LLC, No. 2:20-cv-611-FtM-38NPM; S.Y. v. Best Western Int'l, Inc., No. 2:20-cv-616-FtM-38MRM; S.Y. v. Marriott Int'l, Inc., No. 2:20-cv-627-FtM-38NPM; C.S. v. Naples Hotel Co., No. 2:20-cv-631-FtM-38MRM; S.Y. v. Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc., No. 2:20-cv-632-FtM-38NPM; C.S. v. Jay Varahimata Investments, LLC, No. 2:20-cv-637-FtM-38MRM; and C.S. v. Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc., No. 2:20-cv-639-FtM-38NPM. The Clerk is DIRECTED to place a copy of this Order in each listed case. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/24/2020. (AEH) (AEH).
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/24/2020. (WRW)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Jay Varahimata Investments, LLC.. (MLS)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:20-cv-606-FtM-38MRM. (SJB)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by S. Y.. Related case(s): Yes (Hanlon, Sharon)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jay Varahimata Investments, LLC. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17198006) filed by S. Y.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Jay Varahimata Investments, LLC.)(Hanlon, Sharon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S. Y. v. Jay Varahimata Investments, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. Y.
Represented By: Sharon M. Hanlon
Represented By: Yale T. Freeman
Represented By: Virginia E. Anello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Varahimata Investments, LLC.
Represented By: Brooke E. Beebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?