S.Y. v. Sunstream Hotels & Resorts, LLC et al
Plaintiff: S. Y.
Defendant: Park Shore Resort Condominium Assocation, Inc. and Sunstream Hotels & Resorts, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00611
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
2 Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
3 Judge: John E Steele
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of compliance re 25 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by S. Y. (Hanlon, Sharon)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENDORSED ORDER granting #22 Motion of Virginia E. Anello, Esq. for Special Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Pursuant to Local Rule 2.02, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The Clerk of Court is directed to add Virginia E. Anello to the service list. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Virginia E. Anello must send only one required fee to the Clerk's Office for her special appearance in the first-filed Case No. 2:20-cv-118-JES-MRM. The Court hereby waives the required fee for special admission in connection with all other cases pending in the Fort Myers Division in which Virginia E. Anello is granted leave to appear specially for Plaintiffs S.Y. and/or C.S. This waiver does not apply to any other case in which Virginia E. Anello may seek leave to appear specially for any other party or in any other case pending in another Division. Additionally, given the unique procedural posture of this litigation--including the severance of the first-filed action, the resulting proliferation of separate cases, and the relatedness of the claims and defenses involved in each of the severed actions--the Court finds that Virginia E. Anello's appearance in each severed case brought on behalf of S.Y. and C.S. does not constitute the maintenance of a regular practice of law in Florida such that her special appearance should be denied. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Virginia E. Anello must complete and submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. Failure to register may cause the Court to revoke permission to appear specially. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 10/16/2020. (McCoy, Mac)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER denying as moot #21 Motion of Virginia E. Anello, Esq. for Special Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Pursuant to Local Rule 2.02, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing in light of the duplicative motion filed on the same date (Doc. #22). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 10/16/2020. (McCoy, Mac)
October 15, 2020 Filing 23 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:20-cv-611-FtM-29MRM. Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell no longer assigned to the case. Motion(s) REFERRED: #22 MOTION for Virginia E. Anello to appear pro hac vice , #21 MOTION for Virginia E. Anello to appear pro hac vice . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (laf)
October 15, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Virginia E. Anello to appear pro hac vice by S. Y.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sample Order, #2 Exhibit B - Sample Order, #3 Exhibit C - Sample Order)(Hanlon, Sharon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Modified on 10/15/2020 to note duplicate entry see #21 (MLS).
October 15, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Virginia E. Anello to appear pro hac vice by S. Y.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sample Order, #2 Exhibit B - Sample Order, #3 Exhibit C - Sample Order)(Hanlon, Sharon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. By November 2, 2020, Plaintiff will respond to #14 Motion to Dismiss, to Strike, or for a More Definite Statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 10/7/2020. (brh)
October 7, 2020 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss complaint , Motion to Strike, or for a More Definite Statement and Memorandum of Law by S. Y.. (Hanlon, Sharon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting #17 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. By October 21, 2020, Plaintiff will file a response to Sunstream Hotels & Resorts LLC's Motion to Dismiss, to Strike, or for More Definite Statement (Doc. #13). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 10/5/2020. (brh)
October 5, 2020 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint [DE 1] to strike, or for a more definite statement by S. Y.. (Hanlon, Sharon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
October 2, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE to counsel Virginia E. Anello of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SPB)
October 2, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Sunstream Hotels & Resorts, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sunstream Partners, LLC for Sunstream Hotels & Resorts, LLC.. (Martinez, J)
September 28, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss or Strike #1 complaint, or for a more definite statement and memorandum of law in support by Park Shore Resort Condominium Association, Inc. (Beebe, Brooke)
September 23, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint [DE 1] to strike, or for a more definite statement by Sunstream Hotels & Resorts, LLC. (Martinez, J)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. By September 28, 2020, Defendant will respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 9/15/2020. (brh)
September 15, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Park Shore Resort Condominium Assocation, Inc.. (Beebe, Brooke) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Wadsworth and Notice of Appearance by J Marcos Martinez on behalf of Sunstream Hotels & Resorts, LLC (Martinez, J)
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Sunstream Hotels & Resorts, LLC of Waiver of Service of Summons (Martinez, J)
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 PROOF of service by S. Y. (Hanlon, Sharon)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 Case Reassigned to Judge John E. Steele. New case number: 2:20-cv-611-FtM-29NPM. Judge Sheri Polster Chappell no longer assigned to the case. (laf)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 This action and the following cases are TRANSFERRED to Senior United States District Judge John E. Steele with his consent: S.Y. v. Shivparvti, LLC, No. 2:20-cv-607-FtM-38NPM; S.Y. v. Naples Garden Inn, LLC, No. 2:20-cv-610-FtM-38NPM; S.Y. v. Sunstream Hotel & Resports, LLC, No. 2:20-cv-606-FtM-38NPM; S.Y. v. Best Western Int'l, Inc., No. 2:20-cv-616-FtM-38MRM; S.Y. v. Marriott Int'l, Inc., No. 2:20-cv-627-FtM-38NPM; C.S. v. Naples Hotel Co., No. 2:20-cv-631-FtM-38MRM; S.Y. v. Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc., No. 2:20-cv-632-FtM-38NPM; C.S. v. Jay Varahimata Investments, LLC, No. 2:20-cv-637-FtM-38MRM; and C.S. v. Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc., No. 2:20-cv-639-FtM-38NPM. The Clerk is DIRECTED to place a copy of this Order in each listed case. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/24/2020. (AEH) (AEH).
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/24/2020. (WRW)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Park Shore Resort Condominium Assocation, Inc., Sunstream Hotels & Resorts, LLC. (drn)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:20-cv-611-FtM-38NPM. (SJB)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by S. Y.. Related case(s): Yes (Hanlon, Sharon)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Park Shore Resort Condominium Assocation, Inc., Sunstream Hotels & Resorts, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17199690) filed by S. Y.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons All Defendants)(Hanlon, Sharon) (

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S.Y. v. Sunstream Hotels & Resorts, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. Y.
Represented By: Sharon M. Hanlon
Represented By: Diana Yastrovskaya
Represented By: Virginia E. Anello
Represented By: Yale T. Freeman
Represented By: Brian J. Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park Shore Resort Condominium Assocation, Inc.
Represented By: Brooke E. Beebe
Represented By: Daniel Ari Shapiro
Represented By: Dennis Michael Arendall, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunstream Hotels & Resorts, LLC
Represented By: J Marcos Martinez
Represented By: Christopher W. Wadsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?