Marion v. Secretary, DOC et al (Charlotte County)
Petitioner: Jerome Marion
Respondent: Florida Attorney General and Secretary, DOC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00618
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Katie Salemi Ashby on behalf of Secretary, DOC. (Ashby, Katie) Modified on 9/29/2020 to edit filer and docket text (SLU).
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER On or before September 29, 2020, counsel for Respondent is DIRECTED to file a notice of appearance. ORDER to respond and show cause why the petition should not be granted. Response to petition due by 12/14/2020. On or before December 21, 2020, Respondent is DIRECTED to electronically file the state court record on CM/ECF. Petitioner has 30 days to reply to the petition response. Clerk is directed to serve the petition. If applicable, the Clerk is DIRECTED to dismiss all named Respondents except for the Secretary of the Florida Department of Corrections and terminate them from the file. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 9/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus)(SLU)
September 10, 2020 FEES paid by Jerome Marion (Filing fee $5 receipt number FtM014828) (RMT)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jerome Marion. Related case(s): no (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(MLS)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 TRACK ONE AND RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/21/2020. (RMT)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER Regarding Habeas Petition Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/21/2020. (RMT)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - State ( no service copies provided; no fee/ifp) filed by Jerome Marion. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(RMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marion v. Secretary, DOC et al (Charlotte County)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Florida Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary, DOC
Represented By: Katie Salemi Ashby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jerome Marion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?