Grootwassink et al v. Indian Harbor Insurance Company
Plaintiff: ROBERT E. GROOTWASSINK and JOAN M GROOTWASSINK
Defendant: INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv00620
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:0635
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Joan M Grootwassink, Robert E. Grootwassink. (Briggs, Rick)
September 30, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Indian Harbor Insurance Company Related Case Notice (Raudebaugh, Michael)
September 30, 2020 Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Raudebaugh, Michael)
September 30, 2020 Filing 8 PRETRIAL AND DISCOVERY PLAN. (Raudebaugh, Michael)
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Indian Harbor Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent XL Specialty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent XL Reinsurance America Inc., Corporate Parent X.L. America, Inc., Corporate Parent XL Bermuda Ltd. (Bermuda), Corporate Parent Excel Holdings Limited (Cayman), Corporate Parent XL Group, Ltd. (Bermuda), Corporate Parent AXA SA (France), Corporate Parent XLIT Ltd. (Cayman), Corporate Parent AXA SA for Indian Harbor Insurance Company.. (Raudebaugh, Michael)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Parties shall file a Case Management Report and Pretrial & Discovery Plan by 10/22/2020. All parties shall appear telephonically. The toll-free teleconference number is 1-877-873-8018. The access code is 5997085. You will then be prompted to enter a participant security code: 20620. All parties are encouraged to utilize a landline or similarly stable connection free of ambient interference to avoid having any portion of the conference conducted without them. (WRW)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/26/2020. (WRW)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand , Defendants ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Assignment Agreement)(Raudebaugh, Michael)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT for breach of contract against Indian Harbor Insurance Company with Jury Demand filed by Robert E. Grootwassink, Joan M Grootwassink.(RMT)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:20-cv-620-FtM-38NPM. (SJB)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Twentieth Judicial Circuit in and for Lee County, Florida, case number 20-CA-004859 filed in State Court on 07/28/20. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17201058 filed by INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 State Court Docket Sheet 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit 6)(Raudebaugh, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grootwassink et al v. Indian Harbor Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT E. GROOTWASSINK
Represented By: Margaret Ellen Garner
Represented By: Rick Charles Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOAN M GROOTWASSINK
Represented By: Margaret Ellen Garner
Represented By: Rick Charles Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Michael James Raudebaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?