Duffy et al v. Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Plaintiff: Joan Duffy and John Morrissey
Defendant: Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Case Number: 2:2020cv00621
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 PRETRIAL AND DISCOVERY PLAN. (Seibert, Troy)
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. Related case(s): no (Seibert, Troy)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Seibert, Troy)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2020 at 10:20 AM before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Parties shall file a Case Management Report and Pretrial & Discovery Plan by 10/22/2020. All parties shall appear telephonically. The toll-free teleconference number is 1-877-873-8018. The access code is 5997085. You will then be prompted to enter a participant security code: 20621. All parties are encouraged to utilize a landline or similarly stable connection free of ambient interference to avoid having any portion of the conference conducted without them. (WRW)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/26/2020. (WRW)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest.(drn)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest with Jury Demand filed in State Court on 5/21/20 by Joan Duffy, John Morrissey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(drn)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:20-cv-621-FtM-66NPM. (SJB)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 20th Judicial Circuit, case number 20-CA-003339 filed in State Court on 5/21/2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17201173 filed by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit A to State Court Complaint, #3 State Court ANSWER, #4 State Court Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit 1 -Complaint and State Court Pleadings, #6 Exhibit 2 - Lee County Property Appraiser Homestead Records and Florida Driver's License Records of Joan Duffy and John Morrissey, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stape, Maxwell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duffy et al v. Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Represented By: Maxwell Harrison Stape
Represented By: Troy J. Seibert
Represented By: Vincent Alexander Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Duffy
Represented By: Jason Marc Ciofalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Morrissey
Represented By: Jason Marc Ciofalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?