S.Y. v. Choice Hotels International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: S. Y.
Defendant: Choice Hotels International, Inc., R&M Real Estate Company Inc dba Comfort Inn & Executive Suites and R & M Real Estate Company, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00622
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
2 Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
3 Judge: John E Steele
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of compliance re 26 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by S. Y. (Hanlon, Sharon)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ENDORSED ORDER granting #24 Motion of Virginia E. Anello, Esq. for Special Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Pursuant to Local Rule 2.02, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The Clerk of Court is directed to add Virginia E. Anello to the service list. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Virginia E. Anello must send only one required fee to the Clerk's Office for her special appearance in the first-filed Case No. 2:20-cv-118-JES-MRM. The Court hereby waives the required fee for special admission in connection with all other cases pending in the Fort Myers Division in which Virginia E. Anello is granted leave to appear specially for Plaintiffs S.Y. and/or C.S. This waiver does not apply to any other case in which Virginia E. Anello may seek leave to appear specially for any other party or in any other case pending in another Division. Additionally, given the unique procedural posture of this litigation--including the severance of the first-filed action, the resulting proliferation of separate cases, and the relatedness of the claims and defenses involved in each of the severed actions--the Court finds that Virginia E. Anello's appearance in each severed case brought on behalf of S.Y. and C.S. does not constitute the maintenance of a regular practice of law in Florida such that her special appearance should be denied. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Virginia E. Anello must complete and submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. Failure to register may cause the Court to revoke permission to appear specially. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 10/16/2020. (McCoy, Mac)
October 15, 2020 Filing 25 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:20-cv-622-FtM-29MRM. Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell no longer assigned to the case. Motion(s) REFERRED: #24 MOTION for Virginia E. Anello to appear pro hac vice . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (laf)
October 15, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Virginia E. Anello to appear pro hac vice by S. Y.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sample Order, #2 Exhibit B - Sample Order, #3 Exhibit C - Sample Order)(Hanlon, Sharon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED ORDER denying #20 Unopposed Joint Motion for an Extension of Time to Conduct Scheduling Conference and File Case Management Report. All parties are to meet and conduct a Rule 26(f)(2) conference within 30 days of any defendant's first appearance, and there is no explanation why defendant R&M did not participate in the September 28, 2020 scheduling conference. The parties are directed to confer and then file their Case Management Report by October 27, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 10/13/2020. (SM)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER granting #18 Unopposed Motion Requesting Leave to File a Motion in Excess of 25 Pages. Defendant Choice Hotels International, Inc.'s forthcoming Motion to Dismiss will not exceed forty (40) pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 10/13/2020. (SM)
October 12, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice Plaintiff's re #1 Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by R & M Real Estate Company, Inc.. (Torrez, Christyna)
October 12, 2020 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Case Management Report and to Conduct Scheduling Conference by Choice Hotels International, Inc.. (Diamantas, Kyle) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
October 8, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's re #1 Complaint by Choice Hotels International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Diamantas, Kyle)
October 6, 2020 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION to File Excess Pages by Choice Hotels International, Inc.. (Diamantas, Kyle)
October 2, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE to counsel Virginia E. Anello of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SPB)
October 1, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice by R & M Real Estate Company, Inc.. (Coleman, J.)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to the Complaint. By October 12, 2020, Defendant will file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 9/22/2020. (SM)
September 18, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by R & M Real Estate Company, Inc.. (Torrez, Christyna) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
September 18, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Christyna M. Torrez on behalf of R & M Real Estate Company, Inc. (Torrez, Christyna)
September 4, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice by Choice Hotels International, Inc.. (Diamantas, Kyle)
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 08/31/2020 by S. Y. as to Choice Hotels International, Inc.. (Hanlon, Sharon)
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 08/27/2020 by S. Y. as to R & M Real Estate Company, Inc.. (Hanlon, Sharon)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. By October 8, 2020, Defendant Choice Hotels International, Inc. will file a response to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 8/27/2020. (brh)
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Choice Hotels International, Inc.. (Diamantas, Kyle) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle A. Diamantas on behalf of Choice Hotels International, Inc. (Diamantas, Kyle)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/26/2020. (WRW)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 Case Reassigned to Judge John E. Steele. New case number: 2:20-cv-622-FtM-29NPM. Judge John L. Badalamenti no longer assigned to the case. (laf)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Choice Hotels International, Inc., R & M Real Estate Company, Inc. (drn)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:20-cv-622-FtM-66NPM. (SJB)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by S. Y.. Related case(s): Yes (Hanlon, Sharon)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Choice Hotels International, Inc., R&M Real Estate Company Inc with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17201197) filed by S. Y.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons All Defendants)(Hanlon, Sharon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S.Y. v. Choice Hotels International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Choice Hotels International, Inc.
Represented By: Sara M. Turner
Represented By: Kyle A. Diamantas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R&M Real Estate Company Inc dba Comfort Inn & Executive Suites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R & M Real Estate Company, Inc.
Represented By: J. Michael Coleman
Represented By: Christyna M. Torrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. Y.
Represented By: Sharon M. Hanlon
Represented By: Diana Yastrovskaya
Represented By: Virginia E. Anello
Represented By: Yale T. Freeman
Represented By: Brian J. Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?