Flood v. First Family Insurance, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Flood
Defendant: Marra Jason, FIRST FAMILY INSURANCE, INC. and Jason Marra
Case Number: 2:2020cv00623
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #12 Notice of settlement. This action is DISMISSED subject to the right of any party within sixty days to (1) submit a stipulated form of final order or judgment, or (2) move to vacate the dismissal for good cause. The clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 10/15/2020. (SMG)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER. The parties filed #12 Notice of Settlement in which they represented that this matter has settled. By November 11, 2020, the parties will file any items necessary to terminate this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 10/14/2020. (brh)
October 12, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of settlement by Stephen Flood (Feldman, Mitchell)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. By October 13, 2020, First Family Insurance, Inc. and Jason Marra will file a response to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 9/29/2020. (brh)
September 29, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by All Defendants. (Atwood, Scott) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. By September 30, 2020, Defendants will file a response to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 9/15/2020. (brh)
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by All Defendants. (Atwood, Scott) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 08/26/2020 by Stephen Flood as to Jason Marra. (Feldman, Mitchell)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 08/26/2020 by Stephen Flood as to First Family Insurance, Inc.. (Feldman, Mitchell)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/26/2020. (WRW)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to First Family Insurance, Inc., Jason Marra. (Attachments: #1 Main Document)(drn)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Stephen Flood. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Summons (Marra))(Feldman, Mitchell)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:20-cv-623-FtM-66NPM. (SJB)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FIRST FAMILY INSURANCE, INC., Marra Jason with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17201580) filed by Stephen Flood. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Feldman, Mitchell) Modified on 8/20/2020 (drn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flood v. First Family Insurance, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Flood
Represented By: Mitchell L. Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marra Jason
Represented By: Scott Edward Atwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRST FAMILY INSURANCE, INC.
Represented By: Scott Edward Atwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Marra
Represented By: Scott Edward Atwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?