C.S. v. Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: C. S.
Defendant: Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. and Laxmi of Naples, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00634
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mac R McCoy
Referring Judge: John E Steele
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting #17 Motion of Virginia E. Anello, Esq. for Special Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Pursuant to Local Rule 2.02, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The Clerk of Court is directed to add Virginia E. Anello to the service list. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Virginia E. Anello must send only one required fee to the Clerk's Office for her special appearance in the first-filed Case No. 2:20-cv-118-JES-MRM. The Court hereby waives the required fee for special admission in connection with all other cases pending in the Fort Myers Division in which Virginia E. Anello is granted leave to appear specially for Plaintiffs S.Y. and/or C.S. This waiver does not apply to any other case in which Virginia E. Anello may seek leave to appear specially for any other party or in any other case pending in another Division. Additionally, given the unique procedural posture of this litigation--including the severance of the first-filed action, the resulting proliferation of separate cases, and the relatedness of the claims and defenses involved in each of the severed actions--the Court finds that Virginia E. Anello's appearance in each severed case brought on behalf of S.Y. and C.S. does not constitute the maintenance of a regular practice of law in Florida such that her special appearance should be denied. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Virginia E. Anello must complete and submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. Failure to register may cause the Court to revoke permission to appear specially. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 10/16/2020. (McCoy, Mac)
October 15, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Virginia E. Anello to appear pro hac vice by C. S.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sample Order, #2 Exhibit B - Sample Order, #3 Exhibit C - Sample Order)(Hanlon, Sharon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. Counsel notified, pleading filed in incorrect case. Modified on 10/15/2020 (RMT).
October 9, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.. (Phillips, J.)
October 9, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.. (Phillips, J.)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant, Laxmi of Naples, LLC's Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Strike, or for a More Definite Statement. Plaintiff must respond to the pending dispositive motion (Doc. #12) no later than 11/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 10/7/2020. (McCoy, Mac)
October 6, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss complaint , Motion to Strike, or for a More Definite Statement and Memorandum of Law by C. S.. (Hanlon, Sharon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
September 28, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss complaint by Laxmi of Naples, LLC. (Beebe, Brooke)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Defendant, Laxmi of Naples, LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant must respond to the Complaint (Doc. #1) no later than 9/28/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 9/18/2020. (McCoy, Mac)
September 15, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Laxmi of Naples, LLC. (Beebe, Brooke) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
September 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David S. Sager on behalf of Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. (Sager, David)
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Trumon Phillips on behalf of Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. (Phillips, J.)
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER of service returned executed on 09/08/2020 by C. S. as to Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.. (Hanlon, Sharon)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 08/25/2020 by C. S. as to Laxmi of Naples, LLC. (Hanlon, Sharon)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 TRACK NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/26/2020. (WRW)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Laxmi of Naples, LLC, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.. (drn)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John E. Steele and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:20-cv-634-FtM-29MRM. (SJB)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by C. S.. Related case(s): Yes (Hanlon, Sharon)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Laxmi of Naples, LLC, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17201979) filed by C. S.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons All Defendants)(Hanlon, Sharon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C.S. v. Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: J. Trumon Phillips
Represented By: David S. Sager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laxmi of Naples, LLC
Represented By: Brooke E. Beebe
Represented By: Daniel Ari Shapiro
Represented By: Dennis Michael Arendall, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. S.
Represented By: Sharon M. Hanlon
Represented By: Diana Yastrovskaya
Represented By: Virginia E. Anello
Represented By: Yale T. Freeman
Represented By: Brian J. Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?