Newberg v. GEO Group Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Eric Newberg
Defendant: C. Dicks, Donald Sawyer, Wellpath Recovery Solutions, GEO Group Inc., Emily Salema, JP Carner, FNU Velez and Genna Marx Brisson
Case Number: 2:2020cv00646
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying as moot #4 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; denying #6 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff shall, within THIRTY (30) DAYS from the date on this Order, pay $400.00 to the Clerk of the Court. The Court warns Plaintiff that failure to tender this amount or to explain non-payment within the allotted time period will result in the dismissal of this action without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 10/9/2020. (SLU)
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Track 1 notice and Related Case Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Eric Newberg. Related case(s): yes (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(MLS)
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Eric Newberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Accounting, #2 Mailing Envelope)(MLS) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE to the Clerk of the Court by Eric Newberg. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(MLS) Modified on 9/15/2020 to terminate as a pending motion and edit docket text per dk/lc (SLU).
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER for pro se confined litigants. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/25/2020. (RMT)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 TRACK ONE AND RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/25/2020. (RMT)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis for confined individuals by Eric Newberg. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(RMT) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Modified on 8/25/2020 (RMT).
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Genna Marx Brisson, JP Carner, C. Dicks, GEO Group Inc., Emily Salema, Donald Sawyer, FNU Velez, Wellpath Recovery Solutions (no service copies) filed by Eric Newberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit B-1, #3 Exhibit C-1, #4 Exhibit D-1, #5 Exhibit E-1, #6 Exhibit F-1, #7 Exhibit F-2, #8 Exhibit G-1, #9 Exhibit H-1, #10 Exhibit I-1, #11 Exhibit J-1, #12 Mailing Envelope)(RMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newberg v. GEO Group Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Dicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellpath Recovery Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEO Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Salema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Carner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Velez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genna Marx Brisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Newberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?