American Mariculture, Inc. v. Syaqua Americas, Inc.
Plaintiff: American Mariculture, Inc.
Defendant: Syaqua Americas, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00711
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ENDORSED ORDER granting #35 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Defendant may file a reply in further support of its motion to dismiss (Doc. #24) of no more than 3 pages no later than 11/19/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 11/12/2020. (McCoy, Mac)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Leave to File Reply by Syaqua Americas, Inc.. (Gargano, Brian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Syaqua Americas, Inc.. (Gargano, Brian)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 AMENDED CORPORATE Disclosure Statement re #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Mariculture, Inc. (Brinson, Melville) Modified on 11/5/2020 to edit docket text (drn).
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 AMENDED NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice re #7 Notice of pendency by American Mariculture, Inc. (Brinson, Melville) Modified on 11/5/2020 to edit docket text (drn).
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (CORRECTED) re #30 Response filed by American Mariculture, Inc.. (O'Connor, Patrick)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by American Mariculture, Inc.. (O'Connor, Patrick)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SUPPLEMENT re #28 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by American Mariculture, Inc.. (Morera, Bryan)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by American Mariculture, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(O'Connor, Patrick)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement re #6 Track 2 Notice and Corporate Disclosure Order by Syaqua Americas, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent SyAqua Group Pte. Ltd. for Syaqua Americas, Inc... (Gargano, Brian) Modified on 10/23/2020 to amend docket text (MLS).
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Pendency or Related Actions re #6 Track 2 Notice and Corporate Disclosure Order by Syaqua Americas, Inc. and NOTICE of Filing Motion to Transfer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gargano, Brian) Modified on 10/23/2020 to amend docket text (MLS).
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Track 2 notice and Corporate Disclosure Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Syaqua Americas, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gargano, Brian)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Syaqua Americas, Inc.. (Gargano, Brian)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M. Gargano on behalf of Syaqua Americas, Inc. (Gargano, Brian)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GOVERNING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 10/16/2020. (jmc)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GOVERNING TELEPHONIC PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 10/16/2020. (jmc)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of hearing: Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/9/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. DIAL IN INSTRUCTIONS: TOLL FREE NUMBER: 1-888-273-3658, ACCESS CODE: 8335587. Dial in at least 5 minutes before hearing time. Landline preferred. Do not use the speaker phone feature during the call. Notwithstanding any prior Order of the Court, the parties shall file a joint Case Management Report no later than 11/30/2020. To the extent Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2) so requires, the Court finds good cause to extend the time period for entering the Case Management and Scheduling Order until after the Case Management Report is filed and the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is held.(jmc)
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PROOF of service by American Mariculture, Inc. as to Syaqua Americas, Inc. on 9/29/20 (Morera, Bryan) Modified on 10/13/2020 to amend docket text (MLS).
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Renewed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Brian Gargano must send the required fee to the Clerk's Office. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Brian Gargano must complete and submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 10/9/2020. (McCoy, Mac)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to add Jiangang Ou to the service list. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Jiangang Ou must send the required fee to the Clerk's Office. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Jiangang Ou must complete and submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 10/9/2020. (McCoy, Mac)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Brian M. Gargano to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17411745 for $150 by Syaqua Americas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Roepstorff, Matthew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Jiangang Ou to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17411707 for $150 by Syaqua Americas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Roepstorff, Matthew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER denying without prejudice #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by attorney Jiangang Ou. M.D. Fla. R. 2.02(a) requires that an applicant for special admission be "a member in good standing of the bar of any District Court of the United States." Mr. Ou's application does not reflect that he is a member in good standing of the bar of any District Court of the United States. Mr. Ou may renew his motion, if appropriate, with information demonstrating that he is eligible for special admission to practice before this Court under the Local Rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 10/8/2020. (McCoy, Mac)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER denying without prejudice #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by attorney Brian M. Gargano. M.D. Fla. R. 2.02(a) requires that an applicant for special admission be "a member in good standing of the bar of any District Court of the United States." Mr. Gargano's application does not reflect that he is a member in good standing of the bar of any District Court of the United States. Mr. Gargano may renew his motion, if appropriate, with information demonstrating that he is eligible for special admission to practice before this Court under the Local Rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 10/8/2020. (McCoy, Mac)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Jiangang Ou to appear pro hac vice by Syaqua Americas, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(drn) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Brian M. Gargano to appear pro hac vice by Syaqua Americas, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(drn) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Jiangang Ou, appearing on behalf of Syaqua Americas, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number FTM014869.) (SPB) Modified on 10/6/2020, to correct filing date.(SPB).
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Brian Gergano, appearing on behalf of Syaqua Americas, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number FTM014870.) (SPB) Modified on 10/6/2020, to correct docket text. (SPB).
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS issued as to Syaqua Americas, Inc. (drn)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROPOSED summons to be issued by American Mariculture, Inc.. (O'Connor, Patrick)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by American Mariculture, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent American Mariculture, Inc., Corporate Parent Syaqua Americas, Inc. for American Mariculture, Inc... (Brinson, Melville)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by American Mariculture, Inc.. (Brinson, Melville)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER Signed by All Divisional Judges on 9/15/2020. (WRW)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of compliance by American Mariculture, Inc. (O'Connor, Patrick)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE by American Mariculture, Inc. of Filing Civil Cover Sheet (O'Connor, Patrick)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel Patrick J. O'Connor of Local Rule 1.05(e), which states - The Clerk is authorized and directed to require a complete and executed AO Form JS44, Civil Cover Sheet, which shall accompany each civil case as a condition to the filing thereof. State and federal prisoners, and other persons filing civil cases pro se are exempt from the requirements of this subsection. File a completed Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (drn)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:20-cv-711-FtM-66MRM. (SJB)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Syaqua Americas, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17304380) filed by American Mariculture, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Contract)(O'Connor, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Mariculture, Inc. v. Syaqua Americas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syaqua Americas, Inc.
Represented By: Brian M. Gargano
Represented By: Matthew Roepstorff
Represented By: Jiangang Ou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Mariculture, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick J. O'Connor
Represented By: Bryan Morera
Represented By: Melville G. Brinson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?