Paul v. U.S. Attorney General et al (INS DETAINEE - GLADES COUNTY)
Petitioner: Francis Paul
Respondent: Secretary, Department of Homeland Security and U.S Attorney General
Case Number: 2:2020cv00819
Filed: October 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 14 TRANSFER IN from the Southern District of Florida. Case assigned to District Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New Case Number: 2:20-cv-819-FtM-38MRM. (laf)
October 15, 2020 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-23915. File received electronically
October 14, 2020 Civil Case Terminated per DE #12. Closing Case. (pes) [Transferred from flsd on 10/15/2020.]
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Middle District of Florida. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 10/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (pes) [Transferred from flsd on 10/15/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #5 Order to Show Cause by Secretary, Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I-213, #2 Exhibit Criminal Judgment, #3 Exhibit EARM Detention History, #4 Exhibit Notice to Appear, #5 Exhibit Removal Order, #6 Exhibit Fernandez Declaration)(Raurell, Carlos) [Transferred from flsd on 10/15/2020.]
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE re 9 PAPERLESS ORDER: Copy of order mailed to Plaintiff. (pes) [Transferred from flsd on 10/15/2020.]
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court denies without prejudice #8 the Petitioners motion to appoint counsel. Under 18 U.S.C. 3006A(a)(2)(B), the court may appoint counsel for an indigent litigant seeking relief under 28 U.S.C. 2241. However, such appointments are discretionary and proper only when the interests of justice so require. See In re Lindsey, 875 F.2d 1502, 1508 (11th Cir. 1989); United States v. Alford, 816 F. Appx 375, 376-77 (11th Cir. 2020). The interests of justice may require appointment of counsel where the case presents unusually complex factual or legal issues and the litigant is unable to adequately state his argument. See Poole v. Lambert, 819 F.2d 1025, 1028 (11th Cir. 1987); Alford, 816 F. Appx at 376-77. At this stage, however, the record does not reflect such exceptional circumstances. The Court directs the Clerk to mail a copy of this order to the Petitioner at his address of record. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 10/5/2020. (js05) [Transferred from flsd on 10/15/2020.]
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Pursuant to 18 USC 3006A by Francis Paul. Responses due by 10/16/2020 (yha) [Transferred from flsd on 10/15/2020.]
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 Case Reassignment of Paired Magistrate Judge pursuant to pro se Magistrate repairing to Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid no longer assigned to case. (bms) [Transferred from flsd on 10/15/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carlos Javier Raurell on behalf of Secretary, Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Attorney General. Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party Secretary, Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party U.S. Attorney General(pty:dft). (Raurell, Carlos) [Transferred from flsd on 10/15/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 28 U.S.C. 2241. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 9/29/2020. See attached document for full details. (daa) [Transferred from flsd on 10/15/2020.]
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 9/28/2020. (js05) [Transferred from flsd on 10/15/2020.]
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Francis Paul. (daa) [Transferred from flsd on 10/15/2020.]
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (daa) [Transferred from flsd on 10/15/2020.]
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Filing fee $ 5.00. IFP Filed, filed by Francis Paul.(daa) [Transferred from flsd on 10/15/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paul v. U.S. Attorney General et al (INS DETAINEE - GLADES COUNTY)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary, Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Carlos Javier Raurell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S Attorney General
Represented By: Carlos Javier Raurell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Francis Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?