Allstate Construction v. Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Allstate Construction A/A/O Flo Rich Concrete, L.L.C D/B/A Legere's Concrete Specialties and Allstate Construction a/a/o Flo Rich Concrete, L.L.C. doing business as Legere's Concrete Specialties
Defendant: Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00896
Filed: November 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:0635
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Track 2 Notice and Corporate Disclosure Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. Related case(s): no (Vogt, Kelly)
December 14, 2020 Filing 9 PRETRIAL AND DISCOVERY PLAN. (Vogt, Kelly)
December 14, 2020 Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Vogt, Kelly)
November 18, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #4 Complaint with Jury Demand by Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company.(Vogt, Kelly)
November 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2021 at 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Parties shall file a Case Management Report and Pretrial & Discovery Plan by 1/19/2021. All parties shall appear telephonically. The toll-free teleconference number is 1-877-873-8018. The access code is 5997085. You will then be prompted to enter a participant security code: 20896. All parties are encouraged to utilize a landline or similarly stable connection free of ambient interference to avoid having any portion of the conference conducted without them. (WRW)
November 12, 2020 Filing 5 TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER Signed by All Divisional Judges on 11/12/2020. (WRW)
November 12, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company with Jury Demand filed (in State Court 10/15/20) by Allstate Construction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A pt 1, #2 Exhibit A pt 2, #3 Exhibit A pt 3)(MLS)
November 12, 2020 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:20-cv-896-FTM-38NPM. (LRB)
November 11, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent Chubb US Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings Inc. for Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company.. (Vogt, Kelly)
November 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charlotte County Circuit Civil, case number 2020CA000912 filed in State Court on 10/15/2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17537990 filed by Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vogt, Kelly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Construction v. Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Construction A/A/O Flo Rich Concrete, L.L.C D/B/A Legere's Concrete Specialties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Construction a/a/o Flo Rich Concrete, L.L.C. doing business as Legere's Concrete Specialties
Represented By: James Michael Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: Kelly Vogt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?