Ramos v. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mirian Ramos
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00986
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Track 2 notice and Corporate Disclosure Order by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Kohl's Corporation for Kohl's Department Stores, Inc... (Matthews, Ellen)
January 25, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc..(Matthews, Ellen)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FCRA FAST TRACK SCHEDULING ORDER. See Order for Court directives and deadlines. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 1/25/2021. (AEH)
January 21, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Turnier, Andrew)
January 21, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Track 2 Notice and Corporate Disclosure Order by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC, Other Affiliate Experian Information Solutions Inc. for Experian Information Solutions, Inc... (Turnier, Andrew)
January 21, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Track 2 Notice and Corporate Disclosure Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Turnier, Andrew)
January 21, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Turnier on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Turnier, Andrew)
January 13, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 12/31/2020 by Mirian Ramos as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Steinmetz, Yosef)
January 13, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 1/4/2021 by Mirian Ramos as to Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. (Steinmetz, Yosef)
December 28, 2020 Filing 5 TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 12/28/2020. (jmc)
December 18, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. (MLS)
December 18, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (MLS)
December 18, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:20-cv-986-FtM-38NPM. (SJB)
December 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17679084) filed by Mirian Ramos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Steinmetz, Yosef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramos v. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mirian Ramos
Represented By: Yosef Steinmetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew J. Turnier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Ellen T. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?