Humphries v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Robert Humphries
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 2:2020cv00994
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2021 Filing 10 US Marshal 285 form for service by Certified Mail as to Attorney General. (RMT)
January 27, 2021 Filing 9 US Marshal 285 form for service via U.S. Certified Mail as to U.S. Attorney. (drn)
January 27, 2021 Filing 8 US Marshal 285 form for service via U.S. Certified Mail as to Commissioner of Social Security. (drn)
January 6, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (drn)
December 28, 2020 Filing 6 TRACK ONE AND RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 12/28/2020. (jmc)
December 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases is not per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Robert Humphries. Related case(s): No (Kushner, Jonas)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/10. (MLS)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Affidavit of Indigency construed as a Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to file all pleadings in this cause without prepayment of fees or costs. Plaintiff shall have 30 days to prepare and forward the completed service documents along with sufficient copies of the Complaint to the Clerk for service by the United States Marshals Service. Upon receipt of appropriate instructions in proper form from the Clerk, the United States Marshals Service is directed to effect service of process without prepayment of fees or costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 12/21/2020. (brh)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Robert Humphries. (RMT) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Robert Humphries. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(RMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humphries v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Humphries
Represented By: Jonas H. Kushner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?