Aldajuste v Geovera Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Marie Aldajuste and Kenneth R. Duboff
Defendant: GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company and Terrence L. Lavy
Case Number: 2:2021cv00048
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:0635
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Preliminary Pretrial hearing previously scheduled for 3/16/2021 is rescheduled. New scheduling date and time:Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/27/2021 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. DIAL IN INSTRUCTIONS: TOLL FREE NUMBER: 1-888-273-3658, ACCESS CODE: 8335587. Dial in at least 5 minutes before hearing time. Landline preferred. Do not use the speaker phone feature during the call. (jmc)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Joint Motion to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference. The Clerk of Court is directed to continue the currently pending Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference (see Doc. 7) for a period not less than 30 days, subject to the Court's calendar. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 3/9/2021. (WJF)
March 9, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Civil Action Order by Marie Aldajuste. (Perez-Dumois, Gabriela)
March 9, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriela Perez-Dumois on behalf of Marie Aldajuste (Perez-Dumois, Gabriela)
March 9, 2021 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company. (Lavy, Terrence) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. Modified on 3/9/2021 to reflect counsel notified of use of full case number (MLS).
March 2, 2021 Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Perez-Dumois, Gabriela)
March 1, 2021 Filing 11 Unilateral CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT (Plaintiff Only). (Perez-Dumois, Gabriela)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GOVERNING TELEPHONIC PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 2/18/2021. (jmc)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GOVERNING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 2/18/2021. (jmc)
February 18, 2021 Filing 8 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Marie Aldajuste. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Order of Consolidation, #2 Exhibit S.D. Fla. Order of Remand)(Perez-Dumois, Gabriela)
February 8, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of hearing: Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/16/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. DIAL IN INSTRUCTIONS: TOLL FREE NUMBER: 1-888-273-3658, ACCESS CODE: 8335587. Dial in at least 5 minutes before hearing time. Landline preferred. Do not use the speaker phone feature during the call. Notwithstanding any prior Order of the Court, the parties must file a joint Case Management Report on the approved forms for each no later than 3/1/2021. To the extent Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2) so requires, the Court finds good cause to extend the time period for entering the Case Management and Scheduling Order until after the Case Management Report are filed and the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is held.(jmc)
February 5, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (SMG)
February 3, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 2/3/2021. (SMG)
January 20, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand (filed in State Court 9/9/20) by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company.(MLS)
January 20, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company with Jury Demand filed (in State Court on 8/10/20) by Marie Aldajuste. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(MLS)
January 20, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:21-cv-0048-FtM-66MRM. (SJB)
January 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Twentieth Judicial Circuit, case number 2020-CA-2539 filed in State Court on 8/10/2020. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 113A-17786113 filed by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Cover Sheet, County Ct 2019-CC-1192, #2 State Court COMPLAINT, #3 State Court Motion to Dismiss, #4 State Court Amended Complaint, #5 State Court ANSWER, #6 State Court Docket Sheet, #7 State Court Other Documents, # (State Court Cover Sheet, County Ct 2020-CC-1053, #9 State Court COMPLAINT, #10 State Court ANSWER, #11 State Court Docket Sheet, #12 State Court Other Documents, #13 State Court Civil Cover Sheet, 2020-CA-2539, #14 State Court COMPLAINT, #15 State Court ANSWER, #16 State Court Docket Sheet, #17 State Court Other Documents, #18 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lavy, Terrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aldajuste v Geovera Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Aldajuste
Represented By: Gabriela Perez-Dumois
Represented By: Kenneth R. Duboff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth R. Duboff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Terrence L. Lavy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrence L. Lavy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?