Pro Music Rights, Inc et al v. Goldman
Plaintiff: Jake P Noch and Pro Music Rights, Inc
Defendant: Miles A Goldman, Aggravatingestimate, P-Rawl, Cashcahe and Cachclique
Case Number: 2:2021cv00092
Filed: February 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Filing 7 JUDGMENT entered pursuant to the Court's Order dated February 17, 2021.(Signed by Deputy Clerk) (LYB)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED: Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (Doc. #5) is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly, terminate all remaining deadlines and motions, and close the file. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 2/17/2021. (AEH)
February 15, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Jake P Noch, Pro Music Rights, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Roppo, Vito)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION AND ORDER. ORDERED: Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #1) is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint consistent with this Order on or before February 19, 2021. The failure to file a timely amended complaint will result in the case being closed without further notice. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 2/5/2021. (AEH)
February 4, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel Jimmy D. Bailey III that Form JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet is required for the Clerk of Court to initiate a civil docket sheet. File the Civil Cover Sheet in this action using the Notice (Other) event. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RMT)
February 4, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:21-cv-0092-SPC-MRM. (SJB)
February 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Miles A Goldman with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17847672) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Roppo, Vito)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pro Music Rights, Inc et al v. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miles A Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aggravatingestimate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P-Rawl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cashcahe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cachclique
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jake P Noch
Represented By: Vito M. Roppo
Represented By: Jimmie D. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pro Music Rights, Inc
Represented By: Vito M. Roppo
Represented By: Jimmie D. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?