Breeding v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Robert Breeding
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 2:2021cv00119
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER of service returned executed on 03/12/2021 by Robert Breeding as to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Tucker, John)
February 16, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RMT)
February 16, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 2/16/2021. (RMT)
February 16, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (RMT)
February 12, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:21-cv-0119-JLB-NPM. (SJB)
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNUM Life Insurance Company of America (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17883472) filed by Robert Breeding. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Tucker, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Breeding v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Breeding
Represented By: John V. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?