Effs v. U.S. Attorney General et al
Petitioner: Leslie Effs
Respondent: Secretary D.H.S., Officer in charge at Krome Detention Center and U.S Attorney General
Case Number: 2:2021cv00182
Filed: March 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2021 Filing 7 STANDING ORDER REGARDING HABEAS PETITION. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 3/5/2021. (LYB)
March 5, 2021 Filing 6 TRANSFER IN from the District of Florida Southern. Case assigned to District Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New Case Number: 2:21-cv-00182-SPC-NPM. (LYB)
March 5, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-20554. File received electronically
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Having carefully reviewed the record and governing law, the Court hereby ORDERS and ADJUDGES that this case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida. The Clerk for our District shall CLOSE this case. All deadlines and hearings are TERMINATED. Closing Case. Motions terminated: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Leslie Effs. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 3/4/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz) [Transferred from flsd on 3/5/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Leslie Effs. (daa) [Transferred from flsd on 3/5/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman. (daa) [Transferred from flsd on 3/5/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Filing fee $ 5.00. IFP Filed, filed by Leslie Effs.(daa) [Transferred from flsd on 3/5/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Effs v. U.S. Attorney General et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary D.H.S.
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Noticing 2241 US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Officer in charge at Krome Detention Center
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Noticing 2241 US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S Attorney General
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Noticing 2241 US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Leslie Effs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?