Zola v. Commissioner Social Security
Plaintiff: Roni Zola
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 2:2021cv00196
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Taylor on behalf of Roni Zola (Taylor, Kristen)
March 25, 2021 Filing 10 PROOF of service as to Regional Counsel by Roni Zola (Hurley, John)
March 25, 2021 Filing 9 PROOF of service as to Attorney General on 3/18/21 by Roni Zola (Hurley, John)
March 18, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Civil Action Order by Roni Zola. (Hurley, John)
March 16, 2021 Filing 7 PROOF of service by Roni Zola (Hurley, John)
March 10, 2021 Filing 6 PROOF of service by Roni Zola (Hurley, John)
March 10, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (MLS)
March 10, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 3/10/2021. (MLS)
March 9, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Hurley on behalf of Roni Zola (Hurley, John)
March 9, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:21-cv-0196-SPC-NPM. (SJB)
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner Social Security (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17974404) filed by Roni Zola. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Hurley, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zola v. Commissioner Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roni Zola
Represented By: John R. Hurley
Represented By: Kristen Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?