Samad et al v. Board of Immigration Appeals et al
Plaintiff: Amanda Lynn Brown and Mohammed Samad
Defendant: Erin Fatica, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services and Board of Immigration Appeals
Case Number: 2:2021cv00353
Filed: May 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:0702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Filing 6 PROOF of service as to USA served on 5/6/21, USCIS served on 5/10/21, and US Attorney General served on 5/11/21 by Amanda Lynn Brown, Mohammed Samad (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS Delivery Confirmation)(Prada, Mark) Modified text on 5/12/2021 (LYB).
May 3, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 5/3/2021. (LYB)
May 3, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LYB)
May 3, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Board of Immigration Appeals, Erin Fatica, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (LYB)
May 3, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:21-cv-0353-JLB-NPM. (SJB)
May 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Board of Immigration Appeals, Erin Fatica, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BFLMDC-18203255) filed by Mohammed Samad, Amanda Lynn Brown. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of Related Action, #4 Disclosure Statement, #5 Proposed Summons)(Prada, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samad et al v. Board of Immigration Appeals et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Fatica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Immigration Appeals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Lynn Brown
Represented By: Mark Andrew Prada
Represented By: Anthony Richard Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammed Samad
Represented By: Mark Andrew Prada
Represented By: Anthony Richard Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?