Gomez-Alday v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Deborah Gomez-Alday
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and U.S. Attorney
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 2:2021cv00395
Filed: May 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Deborah Gomez-Alday as to U.S. Attorney served on 6/8/2021, answer due 8/9/2021. (Avard, Carol)
June 15, 2021 Filing 7 PROOF of service by Deborah Gomez-Alday as to Office of Regional Counsel on 6/10/21 (Avard, Carol)
June 15, 2021 Filing 6 PROOF of service by Deborah Gomez-Alday as to Attorney General 6/10/2021(Avard, Carol)
May 18, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Civil Action Order by Deborah Gomez-Alday. (Avard, Carol)
May 18, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 5/18/2021. (MLS)
May 18, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (MLS)
May 18, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:21-cv-0395-JLB-NPM. (SJB)
May 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18264176) filed by Deborah Gomez-Alday. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Avard, Carol)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez-Alday v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Gomez-Alday
Represented By: Carol Ann Avard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?