Securities and Exchange Commission v. Palleschi et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Michael Palleschi and David Lethem
Intervenor: United States
Case Number: 2:2021cv00530
Filed: July 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2021 Filing 23 STATUS report by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Criminal Court Order)(Levenson, Robert)
November 3, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE canceling Preliminary Pretrial Conference hearing scheduled for 11/9/2021 (WRW)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDERED: The Government's Unopposed Application to Intervene and for a Complete Stay (Doc. #20) is GRANTED. This action is STAYED until the conclusion of all proceedings in United States v. Palleschi and Lethem, No. 1:21-cr-454-CM (S.D.N.Y.). The Clerk is DIRECTED to add a stay flag on the docket. The parties must FILE a status report on or before December 23, 2021, and every ninety (90) days after. The parties must immediately notify the Court when the criminal proceedings conclude. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 9/24/2021. (AEH)
September 24, 2021 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene and for a Complete Stay with Memorandum of Law by United States. (Tekeei, Negar) Modified as to docket text on 9/24/2021 (JK).
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #17 Motion to Withdraw Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default Against Defendant David Lethem. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 9/24/2021. (SM)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER denying for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) #15 Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default Against Defendant David Lethem. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 9/24/2021. (SM)
September 23, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Withdraw #15 MOTION for Clerk's Default against David Lethem by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Levenson, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
September 21, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by David Lethem.(RMT)
September 21, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Clerk's Default against David Lethem by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Levenson, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
September 13, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/9/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Parties shall file a Case Management Report by 10/19/2021. All parties shall appear telephonically. The toll-free teleconference number is 1-877-873-8018. The access code is 5997085. You will then be prompted to enter a participant security code: 21530. All parties are encouraged to utilize a landline or similarly stable connection free of ambient interference to avoid having any portion of the conference conducted without them. (WRW)
September 9, 2021 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #9 Motion for Clerks Default filed by Michael Palleschi. (Chandler, James)
September 9, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Wesley Chandler on behalf of Michael Palleschi (Chandler, James)
September 9, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Michael Palleschi.(Chandler, James)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying without prejudice #9 Motion for Clerk's Default. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 9/9/2021. (SM)
August 31, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Michael Palleschi by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Levenson, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
August 11, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 08/07/2021 by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Michael Palleschi. (Levenson, Robert)
July 27, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER of service returned executed on 07/27/2021 by Securities and Exchange Commission as to David Lethem. (Levenson, Robert)
July 15, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement Rule 7.1 and Local Rule 3.03 Disclosure Statement by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Levenson, Robert)
July 15, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 7/15/2021. (RMT)
July 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RMT)
July 15, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to David Lethem, Michael Palleschi. (RMT)
July 15, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:21-cv-0530-SPC-NPM. (SJB)
July 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Levenson, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Palleschi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Robert K. Levenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Palleschi
Represented By: James Wesley Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Lethem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: United States
Represented By: Negar Tekeei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?