Cherrystone Court, Inc. v. The Cincinnati Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Cherrystone Court, Inc.
Defendant: The Cincinnati Indemnity Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv00736
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Keefer, Kurtis)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Governing Telephonic Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 10/22/2021. (FN)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 10/22/2021. (FN)
October 22, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of hearing: TELEPHONIC Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/14/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. DIAL IN INSTRUCTIONS: TOLL FREE NUMBER: 1-888-273-3658, ACCESS CODE: 8335587. Dial in at least 5 minutes before hearing time. Landline preferred. Do not use the speaker phone feature during the call. Notwithstanding any prior Order of the Court, the parties must jointly file a Case Management Report on the approved form no later than 12/1/2021. To the extent Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2) so requires, the Court finds good cause to extend the time period for entering the Case Management and Scheduling Order until after the Case Management Report is filed and the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is held. (FN)
October 21, 2021 Filing 16 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Cherrystone Court, Inc. (Herrick, Gregory) Modified on 10/22/2021 (jmc).
October 21, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Cherrystone Court, Inc. Related case(s): No (Herrick, Gregory) Modified on 10/22/2021 (jmc).
October 21, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Gregory Peter Herrick on behalf of Cherrystone Court, Inc. Lead Counsel: Kurtis J. Keefer. (Herrick, Gregory) Modified on 10/22/2021 (jmc).
October 21, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurtis Keefer on behalf of Cherrystone Court, Inc. (Kurtis Keefer) Appearance by Gregory Peter Herrick on behalf of Cherrystone Court, Inc. (Herrick, Gregory)
October 20, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE to counsel Russell Thomson and Kurtis Keefer of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (jmc)
October 19, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Angela Marie Swenka on behalf of The Cincinnati Indemnity Company. Lead Counsel: Angela M. Swenka. (Swenka, Angela)
October 15, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE to counsel Angela Marie Swenka, Esq., and Jenny R. Adelman, Esq., of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (jmc)
October 13, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #3 Complaint by The Cincinnati Indemnity Company.(Swenka, Angela)
October 12, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenny R. Adelman on behalf of The Cincinnati Indemnity Company (Adelman, Jenny)
October 11, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by The Cincinnati Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent The Cincinnati Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Cincinnati Financial Corporation for The Cincinnati Indemnity Company. (Swenka, Angela)
October 11, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by The Cincinnati Indemnity Company. Related case(s): No (Swenka, Angela)
October 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (jmc)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL Action Order, Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/8/2021. (jmc)
October 8, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against The Cincinnati Indemnity Company with Jury Demand filed by Cherrystone Court, Inc. (filed in State Court on 9/8/2021) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Mailing Envelope)(jmc)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:21-cv-0736-JLB-MRM. (SJB)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Collier County Circuit Court, case number 2021-CA-2257 filed in State Court on 09/08/2021. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-18784871 filed by The Cincinnati Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Cherrystone Annual Report, #2 Exhibit B-Cincinnati FLOIR Record, #3 State Court COMPLAINT C-Complaint, #4 State Court Docket Sheet C-State Court Docket Sheet, #5 State Court Other Documents C-State Court Other Documents, #6 Civil Cover Sheet D-Civil Cover Sheet)(Swenka, Angela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cherrystone Court, Inc. v. The Cincinnati Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherrystone Court, Inc.
Represented By: Russell R. Thomson
Represented By: Kurtis Jay Keefer
Represented By: Amanda Christine Broadwell
Represented By: Cary Goggin
Represented By: Gregory Peter Herrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cincinnati Indemnity Company
Represented By: Angela Marie Swenka
Represented By: Jenny R. Adelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?