Rohttis v. Lee County School District
Plaintiff: Ms. Nery Rohttis and Nery Rohttis
Defendant: Lee County School District
Case Number: 2:2021cv00737
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mac R McCoy
Referring Judge: John E Steele
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #2 by Lee County School District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Quick, John)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant must answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #2), no later than 11/23/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 11/9/2021. (WJF)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by Lee County School District. (Soto, Samantha) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Governing Telephonic Proceedings Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 11/8/2021. (FN)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 11/8/2021. (FN)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha Williams Soto on behalf of Lee County School District (Soto, Samantha)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of hearing: TELEPHONIC Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/28/2021 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. DIAL IN INSTRUCTIONS: TOLL FREE NUMBER: 1-888-273-3658, ACCESS CODE: 8335587. Dial in at least 5 minutes before hearing time. Landline preferred. Do not use the speaker phone feature during the call. Notwithstanding any prior Order of the Court, the parties must jointly file a Case Management Report on the approved form no later than 12/21/2021. To the extent Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2) so requires, the Court finds good cause to extend the time period for entering the Case Management and Scheduling Order until after the Case Management Report is filed and the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is held. (FN)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John Joseph Quick on behalf of Lee County School District (Quick, John)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (jmc)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Lee County School District. (jmc)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/7/2021. (jmc)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John E. Steele and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:21-cv-0737-JES-MRM. (SJB)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT Nery Rohttis against Lee County School District with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18786460) filed by Nery Rohttis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Arias, Victor)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Nery Rohttis. (Arias, Victor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rohttis v. Lee County School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Nery Rohttis
Represented By: Victor M. Arias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nery Rohttis
Represented By: Victor M. Arias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee County School District
Represented By: John Joseph Quick
Represented By: Samantha Williams Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?