Weist v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Sandra Lauren Weist
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and United States Attorney
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 2:2021cv00768
Filed: October 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 Filing 11 PROOF of service by Sandra Lauren Weist (Avard, Carol)
November 10, 2021 Filing 10 PROOF of service by Sandra Lauren Weist (Avard, Carol)
November 2, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by Sandra Lauren Weist. United States Attorney served on 10/29/2021, answer due 12/28/2021. (Avard, Carol)
October 28, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nadine Elder on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Elder, Nadine)
October 22, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Sandra Lauren Weist. (Avard, Carol)
October 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Sandra Lauren Weist. Related case(s): Yes (Avard, Carol)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/2010. (jmc)
October 21, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/21/2021. (jmc)
October 21, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, SSA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jmc)
October 20, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:21-cv-0768-SPC-MRM. (SJB)
October 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18839291) filed by Sandra Lauren Weist. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Avard, Carol)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weist v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Lauren Weist
Represented By: Carol Ann Avard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Nadine Elder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?