Laremore v. Knauf Gips KG et al
Plaintiff: Edward Laremore
Defendant: Knauf Gips KG and Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00890
Filed: November 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
2 Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 4 E before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Parties shall file a Case Management Report by 4/11/2022. (FN)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER. Plaintiff shall file the executed waivers of service by February 15, 2022. And defendants shall respond to the complaint by April 4, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 1/27/2022. (SM)
January 26, 2022 Filing 12 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:21-cv-890-SPC-NPM. Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy no longer assigned to the case. (SMG)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER denying as moot #8 Plaintiffs' Motion to Approve Alternative Method of Service of Process in light of Defendants' representations at the 1/25/2022 status conference in Blevins v. Knauf Gips KG et al, Case No. 2:21-cv-887-JLB-NPM. Specifically, at the hearing, Defendants represented that they will waive service of process in all cases filed against them in the Middle District of Florida, Fort Myers Division that were severed from Bennett et al v. Gebrueder Knauf Verwaltungsgesellschaft KG et al, Case No. 8:21-cv-2501-MSS-CPT (M.D. Fla. 2021). No later than 2/1/2022, Plaintiff must serve the standard Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons on Defendants' counsel, Attorneys Danny Dysart and Tim Kolaya. No later than 2/8/2022, Defendants must execute the Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons on Defendant and return it to Plaintiff. Defendants must then respond to the pending Complaint (Doc. #1) consistent with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to attach a copy of this Order to the Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons. Additionally, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to add attorneys Kerry James Miller, Daniel John Dysart, Michael Ryan Dodson, and Timothy Andrew Kolaya (the same counsel who appeared for Defendants when this matter was pending in Bennett et al v. Gebrueder Knauf Verwaltungsgesellschaft KG et al, Case No. 8:21-cv-2501-MSS-CPT (M.D. Fla. 2021)) as counsel of record for Defendants and ensure that the Notice of Electronic Filing for this Order is transmitted to defense counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 1/25/2022. (CM)
January 14, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Edward Laremore. (Doyle, James)
December 15, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Edward Laremore. Related case(s): Yes (Doyle, James)
December 9, 2021 Filing 8 First MOTION Alternative Service by Edward Laremore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Ruling by Judge Ruiz, #2 Exhibit B: Affidavit of Celeste Ingalls, #3 Exhibit C: IMA Article, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Doyle, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. Modified on 1/27/2022 (jmc).
December 6, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co., Ltd.(JK)
December 6, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Knauf Gips KG. (JK)
December 6, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK)
December 6, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK)
December 6, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 12/6/2021. (JK)
November 29, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:21-cv-0890-SPC-MRM. (SJB)
November 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co., Ltd. with Jury Demand filed by Edward Laremore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Knauf Gips KG, #3 Proposed Summons Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co., Ltd.)(Doyle, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laremore v. Knauf Gips KG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Laremore
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf Gips KG
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Timothy Andrew Kolaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Timothy Andrew Kolaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?