Valentin et al v. Mayorkas et al
Plaintiff: Michele Gil Valentin and Sergo Valentin
Defendant: Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas, Director Ur M. Jaddou and Director Shelly Randall
Case Number: 2:2021cv00915
Filed: December 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 24, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 12/20/2021 by Michele Gil Valentin, Sergo Valentin as to Shelly Randall (Served on Karen Potosnak-Clark). (SPB)
December 13, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Michele Gil Valentin, Sergo Valentin. Related case(s): No (JK)
December 13, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Michele Gil Valentin, Sergo Valentin. (JK)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting in part and denying in part #6 Application for Permission for Electronic Filing. Plaintiffs' motion is granted to the extent that Plaintiffs' request leave to submit filings electronically. The Court notes that the Court's website, www.flmd.uscourts.gov, contains useful information for pro se litigants under the "For Litigants" > "Litigants without Lawyers" tabs. Specifically, the "Litigants without CM/ECF Access" tab provides pro se parties with a hyperlink to a form that can be used to electronically submit filings to the Clerk's Office. Plaintiffs' motion is denied to the extent it seeks any greater or different relief, including access to the Court's CM/ECF filing system because it is unavailable to non-lawyers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 12/13/2021. (WJF)
December 9, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Permission for Electronic Filing by Michele Gil Valentin, Sergo Valentin. (JK) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
December 8, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 12/8/2021. (JK)
December 7, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Shelly Randall. (JK)
December 7, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Ur M. Jaddou. (JK)
December 7, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Alejandro Mayorkas. (JK)
December 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Shelly Randall Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number FTM015599 filed by Michele Gil Valentin, Sergo Valentin. Service copies retained by plaintiff with signed issued Summonses. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (JK) Modified to reflect NO exhibit 6 in filing packet on 12/08/2021. (JK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valentin et al v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Gil Valentin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergo Valentin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Ur M. Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Shelly Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?