Harborview Realty, Inc. et al v. Fifth Third Bank, National Association
Plaintiff: Harborview Realty, Inc. and McGregor Real Estate, Inc. doing business as Harborview Rentals
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank, National Association
Case Number: 2:2021cv00942
Filed: December 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE OF SELECTION of Steven V. Blount, Sr. as mediator by Fifth Third Bank, National Association. (Mahle, Jacob)
February 15, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Harborview Realty, Inc., McGregor Real Estate, Inc. Related case(s): No (Herrick, Gregory)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(a)(1) Mandatory Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 2/21/2022; Motions to add or join parties or amend pleadings due by 6/30/2022; Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 12/29/2022; Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 2/1/2023; Rebuttal of expert report by 3/1/2023; Discovery due by 3/29/2023; Dispositive motions due by 6/5/2023; Final Pretrial meeting by 9/29/2023; Motions in Limine due by 10/6/2023; Joint Final Pretrial statement due by 10/13/2023; Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/27/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge John L. Badalamenti; and Jury Trial term set for 11/1/2023 before Judge John L. Badalamenti. Conduct mediation hearing by 4/12/2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 2/15/2022. (FN)
February 15, 2022 Filing 26 Minute Entry for Telephonic Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy: granting 24 Oral Motion by Plaintiff for Extension of Time to File Notice of Related Action by 2/18/2022; granting 25 Oral Motion for Extension of Time to File selection of Court Certified Mediator within 14 days. PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 2/15/2022. (Digital) (FN)
February 15, 2022 Filing 25 ORAL MOTION for Extension of Time to File Selection of Court Certified Mediator within 14 days. (FN) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
February 15, 2022 Filing 24 ORAL MOTION by Plaintiff for Extension of Time to File Notice of Related Action by 2/18/2022. (FN) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
February 14, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Fifth Third Bank, National Association. Related case(s): No (Walton, Victor)
February 7, 2022 Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Mahle, Jacob)
February 7, 2022 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Fifth Third Bank, National Association identifying Corporate Parent Fifth Third Bancorp for Fifth Third Bank, National Association, Fifth Third Bank, National Association. (Mahle, Jacob)
February 7, 2022 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Civil Action Order by Harborview Realty, Inc., McGregor Real Estate, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Harborview Realty, Inc. for Harborview Realty, Inc., McGregor Real Estate, Inc. (Herrick, Gregory)
February 3, 2022 Filing 19 Plaintiff/Counter Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint /Counterclaim by Harborview Realty, Inc., McGregor Real Estate, Inc..(Herrick, Gregory)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Unopposed Motion for Admission to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to add Jacob D. Mahle to the service list. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Jacob D. Mahle must send the required fee to the Clerk's Office. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Jacob D. Mahle must complete and submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 1/28/2022. (McCoy, Mac)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Unopposed Motion for Admission to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to add Victor A. Walton, Jr. to the service list. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Victor A. Walton, Jr. must send the required fee to the Clerk's Office. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Victor A. Walton, Jr. must complete and submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 1/28/2022. (McCoy, Mac)
January 28, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Jacob D. Mahle to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19171504 for $150 by All Defendants. (Quesada, Emilia) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
January 28, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Victor A. Walton, Jr. to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19171449 for $150 by All Defendants. (Quesada, Emilia) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
January 14, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #5 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Fifth Third Bank, National Association by Fifth Third Bank, National Association.(Quesada, Emilia) Modified on 1/18/2022, Counsel notified to use full case number on future filings. (SPB)
January 7, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation on behalf of Harborview Realty, Inc., McGregor Real Estate, Inc. Lead Counsel: Peter J Cambs. (Cambs, Peter) Modified on 1/10/2022, Counsel notified to use full case number on pleadings. (SPB).
December 27, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Emilia A. Quesada on behalf of Fifth Third Bank, National Association. Lead Counsel: Emilia A. Quesada. (Quesada, Emilia)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Governing Telephonic Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 12/22/2021. (FN)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 12/22/2021. (FN)
December 22, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of hearing: Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/15/2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. DIAL IN INSTRUCTIONS: TOLL FREE NUMBER: 1-888-273-3658, ACCESS CODE: 8335587. Dial in at least 5 minutes before hearing time. Landline preferred. Do not use the speaker phone feature during the call. Notwithstanding any prior Order of the Court, the parties must jointly file a Case Management Report on the approved form no later than 2/7/2022. To the extent Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2) so requires, the Court finds good cause to extend the time period for entering the Case Management and Scheduling Order until after the Case Management Report is filed and the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is held. (FN)
December 21, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE to counsel Peter Cambs; Emilia A. Quesada of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK)
December 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK)
December 21, 2021 Filing 6 CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 12/21/2021. (JK)
December 21, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Fifth Third Bank, National Association filed by Harborview Realty, Inc., McGregor Real Estate, Inc. filed in STATE COURT on 11/19/2021.(JK)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Defendant Fifth Third's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint and striking [3-1] Defendant Fifth Third's Notice of Unavailability. Defendant Fifth Third's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is granted to the extent it seeks an extension of time to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendant Fifth Third Bank, National Association must respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Doc. #1) no later than 1/14/2022. However, the Court strikes [3-1] Defendant Fifth Third's Notice of Unavailability. Under the new local rules, counsel may not file a "notice of unavailability." See M.D. Fla. R. 3.08(c). The Clerk of Court is directed to strike Defendant Fifth Third's Notice of Unavailability (Doc. [3-1]) and to indicate on the docket that the filing is stricken by this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 12/20/2021. (CM)
December 20, 2021 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Fifth Third Bank, National Association. Exhibit STRICKEN pursuant to Order 4. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant Fifth Third's Notice of Unavailability) (Quesada, Emilia) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. Modified on 12/21/2021, to add details per doc.4. (SPB).
December 20, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:21-cv-0942-JLB-MRM. (SJB)
December 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 20th Judicial Circuit Court, in and for Collier County, Florida, case number 11-2021-CA-002710-0001-XX filed in State Court on 11/19/21. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-19043329 filed by Fifth Third Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT State Court Complaint with Exhibits, #2 State Court Docket Sheet State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents State Court - Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Quesada, Emilia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harborview Realty, Inc. et al v. Fifth Third Bank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harborview Realty, Inc.
Represented By: Peter Cambs
Represented By: Peter James Cambs, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McGregor Real Estate, Inc. doing business as Harborview Rentals
Represented By: Peter Cambs
Represented By: Peter James Cambs, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank, National Association
Represented By: Emilia A. Quesada
Represented By: Jacob D. Mahle
Represented By: Victor A. Walton
Represented By: Victor A. Walton, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?