Watler v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Plaintiff: Rina Watler
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Case Number: 2:2022cv00030
Filed: January 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ENDORSED ORDER granting #32 Motion for Leave to File Document. On or before March 16, 2022, Defendant may file a reply not to exceed 7 pages, excluding the case caption and signature block. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 3/9/2022. (JHA)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply Memorandum In Support of its Motion to Dismiss Complaint by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Thomas, Michael)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RESPONSE to Motion re #21 MOTION for the Courts to take judicial notice regarding filed by Rina Watler. (Bogle, Brandon) Modified as to docket text on 3/4/2022 (JK).
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 RESPONSE re #16 Request for oral argument filed by Rina Watler. (Bogle, Brandon) Modified as to docket text on 3/4/2022 (JK).
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Rina Watler. Related case(s): Yes (Bogle, Brandon)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Rina Watler. (Bogle, Brandon) Modified as to docket text on 3/4/2022 (JK).
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Rina Watler. (Bogle, Brandon) Modified as to docket text on 3/4/2022 (JK).
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #14 Unopposed Motion for Admission to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to add Carter F. Thurman to the service list. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Carter F. Thurman must send the required fee to the Clerk's Office. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Carter F. Thurman must complete and submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 2/10/2022. (CM)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #13 Unopposed Motion for Admission to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to add Matthew J. Malinowski to the service list. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Matthew J. Malinowski must send the required fee to the Clerk's Office. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Matthew J. Malinowski must complete and submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 2/10/2022. (CM)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #12 Unopposed Motion for Admission to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to add Robert E. Johnston to the service list. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Robert E. Johnston must send the required fee to the Clerk's Office. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Robert E. Johnston must complete and submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 2/10/2022. (CM)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #11 Unopposed Motion for Admission to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to add Kathryn S. Jensen to the service list. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Kathryn S. Jensen must send the required fee to the Clerk's Office. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Kathryn S. Jensen must complete and submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 2/10/2022. (CM)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon N. Proctor on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Proctor, Shannon)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for the Courts to take judicial notice regarding #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Thomas, Michael) Modified as to docket text and even type per lc/JA on 2/10/2022 (JK).
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Governing Telephonic Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 2/9/2022. (FN)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 2/9/2022. (FN)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. DIAL IN INSTRUCTIONS: TOLL FREE NUMBER: 1-888-273-3658, ACCESS CODE: 8335587. Dial in at least 5 minutes before hearing time. Landline preferred. Do not use the speaker phone feature during the call. Notwithstanding any prior Order of the Court, the parties must jointly file a Case Management Report on the approved form no later than 3/21/2022. To the extent Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2) so requires, the Court finds good cause to extend the time period for entering the Case Management and Scheduling Order until after the Case Management Report is filed and the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is held. (FN)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Novartis Finance Corporation, a New York corporation, Corporate Parent Novartis Corporation, a New York corporation, Corporate Parent Novartis Holding, AG, a Swiss company, Corporate Parent Novartis AG, a Swiss company for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.. (Thomas, Michael)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REQUEST for oral argument re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Thomas, Michael)Modified to reflect counsel notified of full use of case number on filings on 2/9/2022 (JK).
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Thomas, Michael) Modified to reflect counsel notified of full use of case number on filings on 2/9/2022 (JK).
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Carter F. Thurman to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19218011 for $150 by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Special Admission Certificate)(Thomas, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. Modified to reflect counsel notified of full use of case number on filings on 2/9/2022 (JK).
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Matthew J. Malinowski to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19217994 for $150 by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Special Admission Certificate)(Thomas, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. Modified to reflect counsel notified of full use of case number on filings on 2/9/2022 (JK).
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Robert E. Johnston to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19217966 for $150 by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Special Admission Certificate)(Thomas, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. Modified to reflect counsel notified of full use of case number on filings on 2/9/2022 (JK).
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Kathryn S. Jensen to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19217926 for $150 by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Special Admission Certificate)(Thomas, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. Modified to reflect counsel notified of full use of case number on filings on 2/9/2022 (JK).
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Rina Watler identifying Corporate Parent Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Other Affiliate Novartis AG for Rina Watler. (Bogle, Brandon)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 01/19/2022 by Rina Watler as to Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Bogle, Brandon)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROOF of service by Rina Watler (Bogle, Brandon) Modified to reflect request sent to counsel to refile under the correct case event on 1/20/2022 (JK).
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Brandon L. Bogle on behalf of Rina Watler. Lead Counsel: Brandon L. Bogle. (Bogle, Brandon)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (JK)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 1/18/2022. (JK)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:22-cv-0030-JLB-MRM. (SJB)
January 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-19126492) filed by Rina Watler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Bogle, Brandon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watler v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rina Watler
Represented By: Brandon L. Bogle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: Michael J. Thomas
Represented By: Carter Fleeth Thurman
Represented By: Chase Edward Boswell
Represented By: Kathryn S. Jensen
Represented By: Matthew J. Malinowski
Represented By: Robert E. Johnston
Represented By: Shannon N. Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?