Davis v. Propel Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Warren Davis
Defendant: Propel Holdings, Inc., CBW Bank, CENTRINEX, LLC and Propel Holdings, Inc. doing business as Creditfresh
Case Number: 2:2022cv00147
Filed: March 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER. Before the Court is the parties' Notice of Settlement. (Doc. #23). As the parties have settled this action, the Court will administratively close the case and dismiss this action without prejudice. See M.D. Fla. R. 3.09(b). Accordingly, it is ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice subject to the right of a party to move to reopen the case for entry of a stipulated final order or a judgment or for further proceedings on or before June 2, 2022. See M.D. Fla. R. 3.09(b). If no party files an appropriate paper by that deadline, then the Clerk is DIRECTED to dismiss the action with prejudice and enter judgment without further order. The Clerk is now DIRECTED to deny all pending motions as moot, terminate any deadlines, and administratively close the case. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 5/3/2022. (BLW)
May 3, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of settlement by Warren Davis (Bonan, Thomas)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER. Defendants have not filed a response to the Complaint and the time to do so has expired. (Doc. 21). Accordingly, the Court ORDERS Defendants to show cause why they missed that deadline on or before May 6, 2022, or alternatively, file a response to the Complaint by that date. The Court notes that the parties were trying to resolve the dispute. (Doc. #17). If the case has settled, the parties should file a notice of settlement or dismissal by May 6, 2022. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 5/3/2022. (BLW)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ENDORSED ORDER granting #17 Defendants' Joint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants must answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, (Doc. #1), no later than 5/2/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 4/12/2022. (WJF)
April 12, 2022 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Warren Davis. (Bonan, Thomas)
April 12, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Thomas Martin Bonan on behalf of Warren Davis. Lead Counsel: Thomas M. Bonan. (Bonan, Thomas)
April 12, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Warren Davis. Related case(s): No (Bonan, Thomas)
April 11, 2022 Filing 17 Joint Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by CBW Bank. (Solano, Sara) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. Modified on 4/11/2022 (jmc).
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Governing Telephonic Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 3/29/2022. (FN)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 3/29/2022. (FN)
March 29, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/31/2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. DIAL IN INSTRUCTIONS: TOLL FREE NUMBER: 1-888-273-3658, ACCESS CODE: 8335587. Dial in at least 5 minutes before hearing time. Landline preferred. Do not use the speaker phone feature during the call. Notwithstanding any prior Order of the Court, the parties must jointly file a Case Management Report on the approved form no later than 5/11/2022. To the extent Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2) so requires, the Court finds good cause to extend the time period for entering the Case Management and Scheduling Order until after the Case Management Report is filed and the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is held. (FN)
March 29, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by CBW Bank, Propel Holdings, Inc. Related case(s): No (Solano, Sara) Modified on 3/29/2022 (jmc).
March 29, 2022 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by CBW Bank, Propel Holdings, Inc., identifying Corporate Parent Credit Fresh Payment Solutions Inc., a wholly-owned subsidiary of Propel Holdings, Inc. for CBW Bank, Propel Holdings, Inc. (Solano, Sara) Modified on 3/29/2022 (jmc).
March 29, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Lauren Solano on behalf of CBW Bank, Propel Holdings, Inc. (Solano, Sara)
March 28, 2022 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on March 21, 2022 by Warren Davis as to Centrinex, LLC. (Bonan, Thomas)
March 28, 2022 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on March 21, 2022 by Warren Davis as to CBW Bank. (Bonan, Thomas)
March 8, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to Centrinex, LLC. (JK)
March 8, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to CBW Bank. (JK)
March 8, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Propel Holdings, Inc. (JK)
March 8, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK)
March 8, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK)
March 8, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 3/8/2022. (JK)
March 7, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:22-cv-0147-SPC-MRM. (SJB)
March 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-19309623) filed by Warren Davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet #2 Composite Exhibits A and B, #3 Proposed Summons Propel, #4 Proposed Summons CBW, #5 Proposed Summons Cent)(Bonan, Thomas) Modified to remove duplicate docket text on 3/8/2022 (JK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Propel Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Davis
Represented By: Thomas Martin Bonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Propel Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBW Bank
Represented By: Sara Lauren Solano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTRINEX, LLC
Represented By: Lauren G. Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Propel Holdings, Inc. doing business as Creditfresh
Represented By: Sara Lauren Solano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?