Felker v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Darlene Louise Felker
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 2:2022cv00221
Filed: April 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff memorandum due by 8/2/2022 and Defendant memorandum due by 10/3/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 6/3/2022. (FN)
June 3, 2022 Filing 15 SOCIAL security transcript of administrative proceedings re #12 Answer to Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix, #3 Appendix, #4 Appendix, #5 Appendix, #6 Appendix, #7 Appendix, #8 Appendix, #9 Appendix, #10 Appendix, #11 Appendix, #12 Appendix, #13 Appendix, #14 Appendix, #15 Appendix, #16 Appendix, #17 Appendix, #18 Appendix, #19 Appendix, #20 Appendix, #21 Appendix, #22 Appendix)(Rudy, John)
June 3, 2022 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by by Commissioner of Social Security. Modified as to docket text on 6/3/2022 (JK).
June 3, 2022 Filing 13 CONSENT to trial by U.S. Magistrate Judge by Commissioner of Social Security. (Rudy, John)
June 3, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security.(Rudy, John)
April 11, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Nadine Elder on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Elder, Nadine)
April 8, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Erik William Berger on behalf of Darlene Louise Felker. Lead Counsel: Erik W. Berger. (Berger, Erik)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form), construed as a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis under 28 U.S.C. 1915 and M.D. Fla. R. 6.03. The Clerk of Court is directed to file all pleadings in this case without requiring prepayment of fees or costs. Unless already done, the Clerk of Court is directed to comply with the procedures specified in In re: Administrative Orders of the Chief Judge, Case No. 3:21-mc-1-TJC, Doc. 43 at 1-2 (Dec. 7, 2021), for ensuring that the United States Attorney's Office for the Middle District of Florida is notified of this action through the designated Assistant United States Attorney. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 4/6/2022. (CM)
April 6, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK)
April 6, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Standing Order on Management of Social Security Cases, 3:21-mc-1-TJC, Doc. #43. (JK)
April 6, 2022 Filing 6 CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/6/2022. (JK)
April 6, 2022 Filing 5 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:22-cv-0221-SPC-MRM. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (SJB)
April 6, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Darlene Louise Felker. Related case(s): No (Berger, Erik)
April 6, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Darlene Louise Felker. (Berger, Erik)
April 6, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Darlene Louise Felker. (Berger, Erik)
April 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Darlene Louise Felker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Berger, Erik)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Felker v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Louise Felker
Represented By: Erik William Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John F. Rudy, III
Represented By: Nadine Elder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?