Maribona v. Walmart Stores East, LP
Plaintiff: Wilfredo Maribona
Defendant: Walmart Stores East, LP and Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Case Number: 2:2022cv00244
Filed: April 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mac R McCoy
Referring Judge: John E Steele
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Wilfredo Maribona. Related case(s): No (Purow, Malcolm)
June 8, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Malcolm A. Purow on behalf of Wilfredo Maribona. Lead Counsel: Malcolm A. Purow. (Purow, Malcolm)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(a)(1) Mandatory Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 6/24/2022; Motions to Add or Join Parties or Amend Pleadings due by 10/21/2022; Plaintiff Disclosure of any Expert Report due by 4/26/2023; Defendant Disclosure of any Expert Report due by 5/26/2023; Rebuttal of Expert Report due by 6/26/2023; Discovery and Motions to Compel Discovery due by 7/26/2023; Conduct Mediation hearing by 8/9/2023 (lead counsel to coordinate dates); Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 9/26/2023; Final Pretrial Meeting to occur by 1/26/2024; Motions in Limine due by 2/2/2024; Joint Final Pretrial Statement due by 2/9/2024; Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/23/2024 at 09:30 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele; and Jury Trial Term commencing on 3/4/2024 in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 6/7/2022. (FN)
June 7, 2022 Filing 19 Minute Entry for In Person Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy: granting 16 Oral Motion by Plaintiff for Extension of Time to File Designation of Lead Counsel of Record by 6/14/2022; granting 17 Oral Motion by Plaintiff for Extension of Time to File Notice of Related Action by 6/14/2022; and granting 18 Joint Oral Motion by the Parties to approve Mediator designated in Case Management Report. PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 6/7/2022. (Digital) (FN)
June 7, 2022 Filing 18 JOINT ORAL MOTION by the Parties to approve Mediator designated in Case Management Report. (FN) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
June 7, 2022 Filing 17 ORAL MOTION by Plaintiff for extension of time to file Notice of Related Action by 6/14/2022. (FN) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
June 7, 2022 Filing 16 ORAL MOTION by Plaintiff for extension of time to file Designation of Lead Counsel of Record by 6/14/2022. (FN) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER striking #14 Plaintiff's Mandatory Initial Disclosure as improperly filed discovery materials. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(d)(1)(A); Middle District Discovery (2021) at Section I.C.1. The Clerk of Court is directed to strike this filing and to indicate on the docket that the filing is stricken by this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 6/3/2022. (CM)
June 3, 2022 Filing 14 STRICKEN pursuant to #14. MOTION for Discovery Plain Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Wilfredo Maribona. (Purow, Malcolm) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. Modified on 6/6/2022, to add stricken language. (SPB).
May 6, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Wilfredo Maribona. (Purow, Malcolm)
May 5, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. Related case(s): No (Sharkey Ross, Amanda)
May 5, 2022 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Tanner, Madison)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 4/20/2022. (FN)
April 20, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/7/2022 at 10:30 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 C before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. Notwithstanding any prior Order of the Court, the parties must jointly file a Case Management Report on the approved form no later than 5/25/2022. To the extent Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2) so requires, the Court finds good cause to extend the time period for entering the Case Management and Scheduling Order until after the Case Management Report is filed and the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is held. (FN)
April 20, 2022 Filing 8 CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/20/2022. (SPB)
April 20, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #6 Complaint with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Filed in State Court on 2/22/2022.)(SPB)
April 20, 2022 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Stores East, LP with Jury Demand filed by Wilfredo Maribona. (Filed in State Court on 1/25/2022.)(SPB)
April 15, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Walmart Stores East, LP. (Sharkey Ross, Amanda)
April 15, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Amanda J. Sharkey Ross on behalf of Walmart Stores East, LP. Lead Counsel: Amanda J. Sharkey Ross. (Sharkey Ross, Amanda)
April 15, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Madison Allen Tanner on behalf of Walmart Stores East, LP (Tanner, Madison)
April 15, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John E. Steele and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:22-cv-0244-JES-MRM. (SJB)
April 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Collier County Circuit Court, case number 22-CA-129 filed in State Court on 01/25/22. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-19466377 filed by Walmart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Other Documents Exhibit B - State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit C - Pltf's Ans. to ROGS redacted, #4 State Court Answer State Court Answer, #5 State Court Docket Sheet State Court Docket Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Sharkey Ross, Amanda) Modified on 4/20/2022, to edit docket text. (SPB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maribona v. Walmart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilfredo Maribona
Represented By: Malcolm A. Purow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Madison Allen Tanner
Represented By: Amanda J. Sharkey Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Amanda J. Sharkey Ross
Represented By: Madison Allen Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?