The Foundation for Government Accountability v. U.S. Department of Justice
Plaintiff: The Foundation for Government Accountability
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice
Case Number: 2:2022cv00252
Filed: April 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER granting #21 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorney Daniel J. Shapiro has no further responsibility in this case. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Attorney Daniel J. Shapiro as counsel of record in this case and to remove him from the electronic service list in CM/ECF. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 6/3/2022. (CM)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Daniel Shapiro to Withdraw as Attorney by The Foundation for Government Accountability. (Shapiro, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 5/24/2022. (FN)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/12/2022 at 10:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 C before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. Notwithstanding any prior Order of the Court, the parties must jointly file a Case Management Report on the approved form no later than 7/5/2022. To the extent Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2) so requires, the Court finds good cause to extend the time period for entering the Case Management and Scheduling Order until after the Case Management Report is filed and the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is held. (FN)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by U.S. Department of Justice.(Lum, Laurel)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Laurel H. Lum on behalf of U.S. Department of Justice (Lum, Laurel)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of compliance re 6 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule by The Foundation for Government Accountability (Chang, Frank)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Frank H. Chang to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to add Frank H. Chang to the service list. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Frank H. Chang must send the required fee to the Clerk's Office. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Frank H. Chang must complete and submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 5/3/2022. (CM)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Frank H. Chang to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19525936 for $150 by The Foundation for Government Accountability. (Harris, Jeffrey) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PROOF of service as to Department of Justice served on 4/25/2022 by The Foundation for Government Accountability (Harris,Jeffrey) Modified on 5/2/2022, to edit service details. (SPB).
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS issued as to U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (SPB)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROPOSED summons to be issued by The Foundation for Government Accountability. (Attachments: #1 AG, #2 USAO)(Harris, Jeffrey)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jeffrey M. Harris on behalf of The Foundation for Government Accountability. Lead Counsel: Jeffrey M. Harris. (Harris, Jeffrey)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by The Foundation for Government Accountability. (Harris, Jeffrey)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order REFUND for duplicate payment. Receipt number AFLMDC-19478604 refunded in the amount of $ $402.00 paid to Daniel J Shapiro. (NLC)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SPB)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/21/2022. (SPB)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE to counsel Frank H. Chang Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SPB)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Jeffrey M. Harris to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to add Jeffrey M. Harris to the service list. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Jeffrey M. Harris must send the required fee to the Clerk's Office. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Jeffrey M. Harris must complete and submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 4/20/2022. (CM)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Jeffrey M. Harris to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19479000 for $150 by The Foundation for Government Accountability. (Shapiro, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Joseph Shapiro on behalf of The Foundation for Government Accountability (Shapiro, Daniel)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:22-cv-252-JLB-MRM. (NAS)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Justice (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19478645) filed by The Foundation for Government Accountability. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shapiro, Daniel) Modified on 4/21/2022, to edit duplicate docket text. (SPB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Foundation for Government Accountability v. U.S. Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Foundation for Government Accountability
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Shapiro
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Harris
Represented By: Frank Hyok Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice
Represented By: Laurel H. Lum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?